This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/18/2023 at 13:45:28 (UTC).

Kleiman v. Procter and Gamble Company

Case Summary

On 09/19/2023 Kleiman filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Procter and Gamble Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas R. Cole. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00590

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas R. Cole

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cathy Kleiman

Defendant

The Procter and Gamble Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew S Baker

Blake G. Abbott

Paul J Doolittle

Defendant Attorney

Kendall Tappan Burchard

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Procter and Gamble Company ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9605282), filed by Cathy Kleiman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Baker, Andrew) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Form

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to The Procter and Gamble Company. (zmc) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

#3

(#3) First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9651391) of Paul Doolittle by Plaintiff Cathy Kleiman. (Baker, Andrew) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

#4

(#4) Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9651391) of Paul Doolittle by Plaintiff Cathy Kleiman. (Baker, Andrew) Terminated Motion on 10/19/2023 (kh). (Entered: 10/19/2023)

#5

(#5) First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9651468) of Blake G. Abbott by Plaintiff Cathy Kleiman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing-SC, #2 Certificate of Good Standing-NC) (Baker, Andrew) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

5 #1

Certificate of Good Standing-SC

5 #2

Certificate of Good Standing-NC

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kendall Tappan Burchard for Defendant The Procter and Gamble Company (Burchard, Kendall) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Defendant The Procter and Gamble Company of Related Actions (Burchard, Kendall) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

#9

(#9) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: Judge Cole and Judge McFarland agree that the cases 1:23-cv-590; 1:23-cv-607; 1:23-cv-613; 1:23-cv-623; 1:23-cv-680 ARE related. Cases 1:23-cv-607 and 1:23-cv-613 are transferred to the docket of Judge Douglas R. Cole.. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole and Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 11/16/2023. (md) (Entered: 11/17/2023)

 

Docket Entries

11/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: Judge Cole and Judge McFarland agree that the cases 1:23-cv-590; 1:23-cv-607; 1:23-cv-613; 1:23-cv-623; 1:23-cv-680 ARE related. Cases 1:23-cv-607 and 1:23-cv-613 are transferred to the docket of Judge Douglas R. Cole.. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole and Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 11/16/2023. (md) (Entered: 11/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE by Defendant The Procter and Gamble Company of Related Actions (Burchard, Kendall) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kendall Tappan Burchard for Defendant The Procter and Gamble Company (Burchard, Kendall) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul Doolittle; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Blake G. Abbott as Co-Counsels. Co-Counsels are directed to register for efiling through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/19/2023. (kh) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9651468) of Blake G. Abbott by Plaintiff Cathy Kleiman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing-SC, #2 Certificate of Good Standing-NC) (Baker, Andrew) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9651391) of Paul Doolittle by Plaintiff Cathy Kleiman. (Baker, Andrew) Terminated Motion on 10/19/2023 (kh). (Entered: 10/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9651391) of Paul Doolittle by Plaintiff Cathy Kleiman. (Baker, Andrew) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to The Procter and Gamble Company. (zmc) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (zmc) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Procter and Gamble Company ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9605282), filed by Cathy Kleiman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Baker, Andrew) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less