This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2023 at 07:58:39 (UTC).

GRAY v. PPS OF INDIANALLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2023 GRAY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PPS OF INDIANALLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark J. Dinsmore and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00849

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DWAYNE E. GRAY

Defendants

PPS OF INDIANALLC

STATE FARM

DON LEVENHAGEN

CANTRELL STRENSKI & MEHRINGER LLP

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CANTRELL STRENSKI & MEHRINGER LLP, DON LEVENHAGEN, PPS OF INDIANALLC, STATE FARM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, filed by DWAYNE E. GRAY. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits -- court documents, #2 Exhibit -- Order, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(DJH) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

1 #1

Exhibits -- court documents

1 #2

Exhibit -- Order

1 #3

Cover Letter

1 #4

Envelope

#2

(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

#3

(#3) Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (LDH) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your complaint has been received. You shall have through July 3, 2023 in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $402.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). A form motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee is being provided for your use. (LDH) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance (no attorney at this time) by Plaintiff DWAYNE E. GRAY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (DWH) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

6 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) NOTICE (consent and reference of civil action to judge), filed by Plaintiff DWAYNE E. GRAY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Copy of Order, #2 Envelope) (DWH) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

7 #1

Exhibit D - Copy of Order

7 #2

Envelope

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE (consent and reference of civil action to judge), filed by Plaintiff DWAYNE E. GRAY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Copy of Order, #2 Envelope) (DWH) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance (no attorney at this time) by Plaintiff DWAYNE E. GRAY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (DWH) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your complaint has been received. You shall have through July 3, 2023 in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $402.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). A form motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee is being provided for your use. (LDH) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (LDH) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CANTRELL STRENSKI & MEHRINGER LLP, DON LEVENHAGEN, PPS OF INDIANALLC, STATE FARM, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, filed by DWAYNE E. GRAY. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits -- court documents, #2 Exhibit -- Order, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(DJH) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less