This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/22/2023 at 09:25:13 (UTC).

Miller v. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The et al.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2023 Miller filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth G. Gale and Eric F. Melgren. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-02233

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

Presiding Judge

Eric F. Melgren

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kara Miller

Defendants

Prudential Insurance Company of America, The

Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC

Prudential Financial, Inc.

Prudential Annuities

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy R. Jackson

Athena M. Dickson

Eric W. Smith

Ryan P. McEnaney

Defendant Attorneys

Ashley Nichole Harrison

William C. Martucci

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6067913.), filed by Kara Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kara Miller. (Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

#3

(#3) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Agreed for Extension of Time by Prudential Annuities, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC, and Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Harrison, Ashley) Modified event per Chambers (mls). (Entered: 06/27/2023)

#4

(#4) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ashley Nichole Harrison on behalf of All Defendants (Harrison, Ashley) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

#6

(#6) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by William C. Martucci on behalf of All Defendants. (Martucci, William) (Entered: 07/03/2023)

#7

(#7) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Prudential Annuities, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC, Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale.) (Harrison, Ashley) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint. Responsive pleading due on or before July 26, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/12/23. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Prudential Annuities, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC, Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale.) (Harrison, Ashley) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by William C. Martucci on behalf of All Defendants. (Martucci, William) (Entered: 07/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER, granting as unopposed, #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Although the stipulation is not proper, the Court will interpret the filing as an unopposed motion to extend the answer deadline. The Court thus grants the motion and extends the deadline to answer or otherwise plead to 7/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/29/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ashley Nichole Harrison on behalf of All Defendants (Harrison, Ashley) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Agreed for Extension of Time by Prudential Annuities, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC, and Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Harrison, Ashley) Modified event per Chambers (mls). (Entered: 06/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Prudential Annuities, Prudential Financial, Inc., Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC, Prudential Insurance Company of America, The (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kara Miller. (Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6067913.), filed by Kara Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Dickson, Athena) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less