This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2023 at 08:08:27 (UTC).

Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. v. Xerox Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/29/2023 Flexiworld Technologies, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Xerox Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth A. Wolford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-06372

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth A. Wolford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.

Defendant

Xerox Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Austin Ginnings

Timothy Edward Grochocinski

Peter John Glennon

Defendant Attorney

Eric J. Ward

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Xerox Corporation. (Ward, Eric) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, extending time to answer complaint by Xerox Corporation. (Ward, Eric) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Ward on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Ward, Eric) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

8 #5

ECF Registration

8 #4

Civility Principles

8 #3

Attorney Oath

8 #2

Sponsorship Affidavit

8 #1

Petition for Attorney Admission

7 #1

Petition for Attorney Admission

1 #10

Proposed Summons

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#12) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, extending time to answer complaint by Xerox Corporation. (Ward, Eric) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/03/2023

Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the stipulation signed by the parties (Dkt. 12), Defendant's response to the complaint in Case No. 6:23-CV-06372 is due on or before September 15, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 08/03/2023. (MGB) (Entered: 08/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Xerox Corporation. (Ward, Eric) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, extending time to answer complaint by Xerox Corporation. (Ward, Eric) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Ward on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Ward, Eric) (Entered: 08/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketE-Filing Notification: Please note for future reference that the proper event is summons returned executed. No action required re AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint. (TF) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Charles Austin Ginnings; granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Timothy Edward Grochocinski. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 07/18/2023. (MGB)Clerk to Follow up (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Xerox Corporation C/O Corporation Service Company on July 13, 2023, filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4925840.) by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Attorney Admission, #2 Sponsorship Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles, #5 ECF Registration)(Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 07/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4925832.) by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Attorney Admission, #2 Sponsorship Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles, #5 ECF Registration)(Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 07/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-Filing Notification: ***Motions terminated: #5 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for attorney C. Austin Ginnings filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc., #6 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for attorney Timothy Grochocinski filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. PHV applications contain copies of each attorney's Sponsoring Affidavit, Application for attorney Timothy E. Grochocinski has attorney's name misspelled. Refile motions as per L.R.Civ.P 83.1 (d). (DDS) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4923863.) by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Sponsorship affidavit, #3 Attorney oath, #4 Civility Principles, #5 ECF Registration)(Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4923842.) by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Sponsorship affidavit, #3 Attorney oath, #4 Civility Principles, #5 ECF Registration)(Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketATTENTION ALL PLAINTIFFS OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and/or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark Case sent to USPTO. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and exhibits, #2 Exhibit 6-8)(TF) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Xerox Corporation. (TF) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TF) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Xerox Corporation $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4912732, filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 AO 120 Form)(Glennon, Peter) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less