This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2023 at 08:51:06 (UTC).

McGuire v. KB Orthopedics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2023 McGuire filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against KB Orthopedics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey J. Helmick(MDL2197). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-DP-20023

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey J. Helmick(MDL2197)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keith McGuire

Defendants

KB Orthopedics, Inc.

Karl Buhr

Medical Device Business Services, Inc.

Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maxwell E. Kirchhoff

Jory C. Ruggiero

Michael J. Cowgill

Defendant Attorneys

Eric M. Friedman

Susan M. Sharko

Maxon R. Davis

Cha'yra Eddie

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's #3 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by All Defendants. (Sharko, Susan) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

#22

(#22) Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for leave (Related Doc #21 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/19/2023. (M,CE) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

21 #2

Proposed Order

21 #1

Exhibit A - Defendants' Sur-Reply

#21

(#21) Motion for leave to File Surreply In Response to Plaintiff's Reply In Support of Expedited Motion for Remand and for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Karl Buhr, Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., KB Orthopedics, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. Related document(s) #3 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Sur-Reply, #2 Proposed Order)(Sharko, Susan) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

20 #3

Errata Exb C - DePuy Learning Program

20 #1

Exhibit Exb A - Findings & Recommendations

#20

(#20) Reply in support of #3 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Keith McGuire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exb A - Findings & Recommendations, #2 Exhibit Exb B - Transcript of Oral Argument, #3 Errata Exb C - DePuy Learning Program)(Cowgill, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

4 #3

Exhibit 3

4 #2

Exhibit 2

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

(#20) Reply in support of #3 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Keith McGuire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exb A - Findings & Recommendations, #2 Exhibit Exb B - Transcript of Oral Argument, #3 Errata Exb C - DePuy Learning Program)(Cowgill, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

#2

(#2) RECEIPT of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL filed 5/17/2023. (NOS) [Transferred from mtd on 8/4/2023.] (Entered: 05/18/2023)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Buhr Declaration

1 #2

McFalls Declaration

1 #1

State Ct Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Medical Device Business Services, Inc.; DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.; and Johnson & Johnson from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV-32-2023-0000249-PL. (Attachments: #1 State Ct Complaint, #2 McFalls Declaration, #3 Buhr Declaration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) [Transferred from mtd on 8/4/2023.] (Entered: 05/10/2023)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's #3 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by All Defendants. (Sharko, Susan) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for leave (Related Doc #21 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/19/2023. (M,CE) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) Motion for leave to File Surreply In Response to Plaintiff's Reply In Support of Expedited Motion for Remand and for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Karl Buhr, Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., KB Orthopedics, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. Related document(s) #3 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Sur-Reply, #2 Proposed Order)(Sharko, Susan) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) Reply in support of #3 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Keith McGuire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exb A - Findings & Recommendations, #2 Exhibit Exb B - Transcript of Oral Argument, #3 Errata Exb C - DePuy Learning Program)(Cowgill, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand and for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by All Defendants. (Sharko, Susan) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for leave to File Brief of up to 25 Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand and for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Related Doc #17 ). Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 8/30/2023. (M,CE) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) Motion for leave to File Brief of up to 25 Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand and for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Karl Buhr, Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., KB Orthopedics, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Brief of 25 Pages)(Sharko, Susan) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Friedman filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Friedman, Eric) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Attorney Appearance by Susan M. Sharko filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Sharko, Susan) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Cowgill filed on behalf of Keith McGuire. (M,CE) (Entered: 08/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Remand filed by DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc. (Davis, Maxon) (NOS) [Transferred from mtd on 8/4/2023.] (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Remand. Maxon R. Davis appearing for Defendants DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc. (Davis, Maxon) (NOS) [Transferred from mtd on 8/4/2023.] (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Stay filed by DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Davis, Maxon) [Transferred from mtd on 8/4/2023.] (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION to Stay . Maxon R. Davis appearing for Defendants DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. (Davis, Maxon) [Transferred from mtd on 8/4/2023.] (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER re #3 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees. The request for expedited review is granted. Defendants' response to the motion to remand and request for fees is due on June 9, 2023. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/2/2023. (NOS) [Transferred from mtd on 8/4/2023.] (Entered: 06/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Keith McGuire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Ruggiero, Jory) [Transferred from mtd on 8/4/2023.] (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MOTION to Remand , MOTION for Attorney Fees . Jory C. Ruggiero appearing for Plaintiff Keith McGuire. (Ruggiero, Jory) [Transferred from mtd on 8/4/2023.] (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) RECEIPT of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL filed 5/17/2023. (NOS) [Transferred from mtd on 8/4/2023.] (Entered: 05/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023

DocketFiling fee: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-3067970 (TAG) [Transferred from mtd on 8/4/2023.] (Entered: 05/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Medical Device Business Services, Inc.; DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.; and Johnson & Johnson from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV-32-2023-0000249-PL. (Attachments: #1 State Ct Complaint, #2 McFalls Declaration, #3 Buhr Declaration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) [Transferred from mtd on 8/4/2023.] (Entered: 05/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less