This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/24/2023 at 07:45:51 (UTC).

Mercis B.V. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 Mercis B filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against v The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-03299

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mercis B.V.

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Disney Baby Dreamer Store

DUOLI LIFE Store

Funny Cloth Store

Girl clothes factory shop Store

HYUN toy Store

IZABEBE Baby Store

IZABEBE Online Store

LUMA MUMBABY Store

MICO Baby Store

MICO&MOCO BABY Store

MIKY BABY Store

MOCO Baby Store

Pure Cotton pajamas Store

Shop1102177350 Store

Shop1102195699 Store

Shop1102246048 Store

Shop1102413959 Store

Shop1102521874 Store

170 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Payton Mcmurray

William Benjamin Kalbac

Michael A. Hierl

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to unseal any previously sealed documents in this matter. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 7/13/2023: Mailed notice. (rc, ) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

#39

(#39) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 7/12/2023: (rao, ) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

#38

(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: For the same reasons the TRO was granted, a preliminary injunction against Defendants Nos. 173-188 is appropriate, and is unopposed. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #31 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction. The Clerk is directed to unseal any previously sealed documents in this matter. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to add all defendants listed on Schedule A to the court's docket within three business days. Instructions on how to do so may be located on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/instructions. Upon further consideration, the court determines that the TRO as to Defendants Nos. 1-172 should be further extended to and including 7/13/2023, for the reasons stated in the Court's orders entering and extending the TRO, as well as in Plaintiff's motion #34 to extend the TRO. Because this extension exceeds the maximum duration for a TRO under FRCP 65(b), this extension is again "in effect a preliminary injunction that is appealable, but the order remains effective." H-D Mich., LLC v. Hellenic Duty Free Shops S.A., 694 F.3d 827, 844 (7th Cir. 2012). (rao, ) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

#37

(#37) CERTIFICATE of Service Proof of Service by Michael A. Hierl on behalf of Mercis B.V. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#36

(#36) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mercis B.V. as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto on 6/28/2023, answer due 7/19/2023. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

34 #2

Exhibit 2

34 #1

Exhibit 1

#34

(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: For the same reasons the TRO was granted, a preliminary injunction against Defendants Nos. 173-188 is appropriate, and is unopposed. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #31 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction. The Clerk is directed to unseal any previously sealed documents in this matter. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to add all defendants listed on Schedule A to the court's docket within three business days. Instructions on how to do so may be located on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/instructions. Upon further consideration, the court determines that the TRO as to Defendants Nos. 1-172 should be further extended to and including 7/13/2023, for the reasons stated in the Court's orders entering and extending the TRO, as well as in Plaintiff's motion #34 to extend the TRO. Because this extension exceeds the maximum duration for a TRO under FRCP 65(b), this extension is again "in effect a preliminary injunction that is appealable, but the order remains effective." H-D Mich., LLC v. Hellenic Duty Free Shops S.A., 694 F.3d 827, 844 (7th Cir. 2012). (rao, ) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

#31

(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: For the same reasons the TRO was granted, a preliminary injunction against Defendants Nos. 173-188 is appropriate, and is unopposed. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #31 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction. The Clerk is directed to unseal any previously sealed documents in this matter. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to add all defendants listed on Schedule A to the court's docket within three business days. Instructions on how to do so may be located on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/instructions. Upon further consideration, the court determines that the TRO as to Defendants Nos. 1-172 should be further extended to and including 7/13/2023, for the reasons stated in the Court's orders entering and extending the TRO, as well as in Plaintiff's motion #34 to extend the TRO. Because this extension exceeds the maximum duration for a TRO under FRCP 65(b), this extension is again "in effect a preliminary injunction that is appealable, but the order remains effective." H-D Mich., LLC v. Hellenic Duty Free Shops S.A., 694 F.3d 827, 844 (7th Cir. 2012). (rao, ) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mercis B.V.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20672417. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to unseal any previously sealed documents in this matter. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 7/13/2023: Mailed notice. (rc, ) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Shouthwesten Road Store, Silvia Zhang's store, Skye leng Store, springflower Store, Stay Life Store, Strawberry Jam Peripheral Store Store, SusyFashion Baby Store, TimeHandLife Store, Toy- wholesale Store, TUONXYE Official Store, U&ME Store, Unique art Women Store, Unmumsy Laier Couture Store, VDSM Nail Wholesale Store, VICKY-HOME JEWELRY Official Store, W-AJQ Store, Wansk Lighting Store, WPD Official Store, yanglin91 Store, YANYUN Store, You Are Cute Baby Store, You Life Lannida Store, YOUDAY Store, yuan fan Store, ZENGVEE Fashion Store, zizicheery13 Store, Changshu Mengjie Textile Co., Ltd., Chengdu Lvrann Apparel Co., Ltd., Dongguan Huawang Ornament Manufactory, Guangzhou Onecute Technology Co., Ltd., Hangzhou Yiqin Trading Co., Ltd., Jiangsu Aurora International Trade Co., Ltd., Pujiang Bairunlian Garment Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Onen Ecommerce Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Dahoufa Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Longgang District Jiaolingyu Clothing Distribution Department, Shenzhen Sunnier Electronics Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Wantu Rubber Products Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Xuanruihe Technology Ltd., Co., Suzhou Angels Co., Ltd., Wuxi Shangbo Import And Export Trade Co., Ltd and Yiwu Yixun Toys Co., Ltd. added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: MACT Store, Mental assembly Store, Miss Kitty Store Store, Miss Store, Mother&Baby Supplies Store, Mwx baby Store, My Melodys franchise Store, Nail Charms Factory Store, NailFan Store, NDFSOUL MM0905 Store, Newfashion S Store, Oh Sweety Baby Store, OUFULA Official Store, Oulala Lighting Store, Pets Wardrobe Store, POSTA Store, QITANGXUAN Store, Rainbow Show, ReadNameless Store, richyyy Store, Romantic Home Life Store, RONGPET Store, RUI ZAI Store, SEUONM JPbaby clothes 03 Store, Seven PC Store, Sexy Trend Stickers Store, Shijiazhuang Peige Trade Co., Ltd., Shiyou Packing Store, Shop1102160548 Store, Shop1102166272 Store, Shop1102228028 Store, Shop1102247512 Store, Shop1102251116 Store, Shop1102403255 Store, Shop1102406992 Store, Shop1102421308 Store, Shop1513372 Store, Shop2948219 Store, Shop5253056 Store, Shop5281035 Store, Shop713826 Store, Shop900239429 Store, Shop910975077 Store, Shop911065016 Store, Shop911745474 Store and Shop912624881 Store added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: DavideKacey Store, Dear for Baby Store, DEAR RABBIT Official Store, Deermoo Lifeasy Store, DJrabbit Toys Store, DLMH Official Store, DoiaPet Store, DOVE Sunflower Store, Dropshipping Baby Products Store, Elegant Woman Store, Engraved In Heart Store, FairyA Lighting Store, Fashoin Children's Store, Fetching Store, Foresight Co. Ltd Store, Fruit Wawa Factory Store, FunnyCHood Store, Garden angel Store, GGYY Store, Giol Me Num Official Store, GISLAN Makeup Store, GLANE Apparel Factory, Global Bambino Store, GuangDong Good thing Store, Hakula Matata Store, HeroBaby Store, HizoeChu Toy Store, hongcui Official Store, HongKong Angelbaby Center Store, Huamei Hair Accessories Store Store, Idepet Hom'e Store, IKMJUHN SLSHLYJ Store, Jewelry 32NG0 Store, Jiaolan Flagship Store, jumping meters Official Store, Jun Jun Tiger Toy Store, KISS baby clothes manufacturers Discount store, LAH HXMENG Store, Laoxiangdidianpu Store Store, LeLe Headwear Store, Little Baby Home Store, Little Cute Store, Little maven manufactory Store, LIUMUJIAO Store, LJC First Trend Store, Lovababy Children Garments Store, LssDark Online Store, Luohe JingChi Trading Co., Ltd., LUOSHEN98 Store and Luyi Pet Supplies Store added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Disney Baby Dreamer Store, DUOLI LIFE Store, Funny Cloth Store, Girl clothes factory shop Store, HYUN toy Store, IZABEBE Baby Store, IZABEBE Online Store, LUMA MUMBABY Store, MICO Baby Store, MICO&MOCO BABY Store, MIKY BABY Store, MOCO Baby Store, Pure Cotton pajamas Store, Shop1102177350 Store, Shop1102195699 Store, Shop1102246048 Store, Shop1102413959 Store, Shop1102521874 Store, Shop1102527324 Store, Shop5040244 Store, Starry Pajama Set Store Store, Trend & Comfortable clothes Store, Women's Clothes Factory Store, 86 Lighting Store, Annie and the Sea Store, Annies Store, APP 86 15660053623 Store, Artivia Official Store, Baby go!, BabyFun Store, BibiCola Official Store, Black Red Store, Boom Toy Store, BornToGirl Baby Kids Store, C J Colorful Nail World Store, Cartoon animation surrounding Store, CC Shopping Store, ccbuilding Living hall Store, Children's Accessories Store, chuchu puff Official Store, Colorful Childhood Boutique Kids Store, Confidencer Store, COZOK Clothing Store, Creative Nail Store, CurlyWOO38 Store, Cute Cartoon Store, CW CW Store, Daddy Mommy Baby Surprise Store, Daniels Store and DarkACG Store added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 7/12/2023: (rao, ) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: For the same reasons the TRO was granted, a preliminary injunction against Defendants Nos. 173-188 is appropriate, and is unopposed. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #31 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction. The Clerk is directed to unseal any previously sealed documents in this matter. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to add all defendants listed on Schedule A to the court's docket within three business days. Instructions on how to do so may be located on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/instructions. Upon further consideration, the court determines that the TRO as to Defendants Nos. 1-172 should be further extended to and including 7/13/2023, for the reasons stated in the Court's orders entering and extending the TRO, as well as in Plaintiff's motion #34 to extend the TRO. Because this extension exceeds the maximum duration for a TRO under FRCP 65(b), this extension is again "in effect a preliminary injunction that is appealable, but the order remains effective." H-D Mich., LLC v. Hellenic Duty Free Shops S.A., 694 F.3d 827, 844 (7th Cir. 2012). (rao, ) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) CERTIFICATE of Service Proof of Service by Michael A. Hierl on behalf of Mercis B.V. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mercis B.V. as to The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto on 6/28/2023, answer due 7/19/2023. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto (axk,) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (kra, ) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kra, ) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mercis B.V. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) Modified on 7/14/2023 (rc, ). (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Mercis B.V. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mercis B.V. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mercis B.V.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20672417. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less