This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2023 at 09:38:45 (UTC).

Tendo v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2023 Tendo filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William K. Sessions III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00438

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William K. Sessions III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Tendo

Defendants

United States of America

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Alejandro N. Mayorkas

U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Patrick Lechleitner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Erika L. Johnson, Esq.

Hassan N. Elsouri, Esq.

Fatma E. Marouf, Esq.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Patrick Lechleitner, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America filed by Steven Tendo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law) (Entered: 09/28/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Fatma E. Marouf, Esq. filed by Steven Tendo (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fatma Marouf, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(jh) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

2 #1

Declaration of Fatma Marouf

2 #2

Certificates of Good Standing

2 #3

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hassan N. Elsouri, Esq. filed by Steven Tendo (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hassan Elsouri, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(jh) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

3 #1

Declaration of Hassan Elsouri

3 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

3 #3

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

11/06/2023

DocketISSUED Summons as to Patrick Lechleitner, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (al) Text clarified on 11/7/2023 (law). (Entered: 11/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hassan N. Elsouri, Esq. filed by Steven Tendo (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hassan Elsouri, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(jh) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Fatma E. Marouf, Esq. filed by Steven Tendo (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fatma Marouf, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(jh) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Patrick Lechleitner, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States of America filed by Steven Tendo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law) (Entered: 09/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less