This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/16/2023 at 08:34:24 (UTC).

Clovey v. Abbott Laboratories

Case Summary

On 04/17/2023 Clovey filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02385

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kayla Clovey

Defendants

Abbott Laboratories

Abbott Alkaloidal Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tyrone Anthony Blackburn

Defendant Attorneys

Bridget Kathleen O'Connor

Meir Feder

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Abbott Laboratories f/k/a Abbott Alkaloidal Company filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16547396 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Kayla Clovey, individually, and as the administrator of the estate of Cameron Campbell. (Blackburn, Tyrone) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Kayla Clovey, individually, and as the administrator of the estate of Cameron Campbell (Blackburn, Tyrone) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Kayla Clovey (Blackburn, Tyrone) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 04/01/2023)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories. (JC) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to file on the docket a joint letter describing the case and a completed civil case management plan by May 19, 2023, as further described in the attached mandatory requirements. Requests for adjournment of the deadline for these submissions will be considered only if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Section I.D of the Court's Individual Practices. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 4/4/2023. (MD) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#8

(#8) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-39), Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Illinois for the reasons stated in the order of April 8, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (TLH) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#9

(#9) CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-39), Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Illinois for the reasons stated in the order of April 8, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. (TLH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2023: #1 Transmittal Letter) (TLH). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 04/17/2023)

9 #1

Transmittal Letter

#10

(#10) RECEIVED from New York Eastern; Case Number 1:23-cv-02416 (gcy) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

10 #1

*Restricted*

#11

(#11) MAILED MDL Transfer in Letter to counsel of record. (gcy, ) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Bridget Kathleen O'Connor (O'Connor, Bridget) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Meir Feder (Feder, Meir) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/08/2023

Docket(#14) DOCUMENT ENTERED IN ERROR. (mjc) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Meir Feder (Feder, Meir) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Bridget Kathleen O'Connor (O'Connor, Bridget) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MAILED MDL Transfer in Letter to counsel of record. (gcy, ) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) RECEIVED from New York Eastern; Case Number 1:23-cv-02416 (gcy) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

DocketCase transferred to District of Northern District of Illinois. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (TLH) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-39), Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Illinois for the reasons stated in the order of April 8, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. (TLH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2023: #1 Transmittal Letter) (TLH). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-39), Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Illinois for the reasons stated in the order of April 8, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (TLH) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 04/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to file on the docket a joint letter describing the case and a completed civil case management plan by May 19, 2023, as further described in the attached mandatory requirements. Requests for adjournment of the deadline for these submissions will be considered only if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Section I.D of the Court's Individual Practices. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 4/4/2023. (MD) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 04/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories. (JC) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 04/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Kayla Clovey (Blackburn, Tyrone) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 04/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Hector Gonzalez. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Kayla Clovey, individually, and as the administrator of the estate of Cameron Campbell (Blackburn, Tyrone) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Abbott Laboratories f/k/a Abbott Alkaloidal Company filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16547396 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Kayla Clovey, individually, and as the administrator of the estate of Cameron Campbell. (Blackburn, Tyrone) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less