This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/30/2023 at 07:24:00 (UTC).

Dennis v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2023 Dennis filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Justin S. Anand and Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-03921

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Justin S. Anand

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tina Louise Dennis

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Trans Union, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Powell McClelland, III

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tina Louise Dennis. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12856901) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/31/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Trans Union, LLC. (bgt) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (bgt) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by Tina Louise Dennis. (McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Tina Louise Dennis as to Equifax (McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

#7

(#7) Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (dob) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (dob) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Tina Louise Dennis as to Equifax (McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 10/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by Tina Louise Dennis. (McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (bgt) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Trans Union, LLC. (bgt) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tina Louise Dennis. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12856901) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less