This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2023 at 07:50:17 (UTC).

Nawaz v. Ally Financial, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2023 Nawaz filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Ally Financial, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Margo K. Brodie and Marcia M. Henry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-04094

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

Referral Judge

Marcia M. Henry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mohammed U Nawaz

Defendants

Ally Financial, Inc.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Trans Union, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Antranig Niaz Garibian

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph M. DeFazio

Kelly Anne Cournoyer

Boris Brownstein

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Brownstein, Boris) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

#18

(#18) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ally Financial, Inc.. (DeFazio, Joseph) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Anne Cournoyer on behalf of Ally Financial, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Cournoyer, Kelly) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Settlement as to Trans Union, LLC by Mohammed U Nawaz (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

8 #2

Proposed Discovery Plan

8 #1

Individual Practice Rules

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held on 09/14/2023 at 11:00AM in Courtroom 504 North before Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. All counsel must attend.Counsel are directed to review the attached Initial Conference Order and this Court's Individual Practice Rules for instructions. By 09/07/2023, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the attached Proposed Discovery Plan (also available in PDF format at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/local_rules/ProposedDiscoveryPlanMMH.pdf). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 06/12/2023.(Attachments: #1 Individual Practice Rules, #2 Proposed Discovery Plan) (RC) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed U Nawaz. Ally Financial, Inc. served on 6/8/2023, answer due 6/29/2023. (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed U Nawaz. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 6/8/2023, answer due 6/29/2023. (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed U Nawaz. Trans Union, LLC served on 6/8/2023, answer due 6/29/2023. (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Ally Financial, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC. (KD) (Entered: 06/04/2023)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) (Entered: 06/04/2023)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) (Entered: 06/04/2023)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#14) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Brownstein, Boris) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Brownstein, Boris) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ally Financial, Inc.. (DeFazio, Joseph) (Entered: 07/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER re #16 : Plaintiff reports a settlement in principle with Trans Union LLC. The parties shall file the necessary papers to dismiss Trans Union LLC or a status report by 08/11/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 07/03/2023. (JD) (Entered: 07/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Anne Cournoyer on behalf of Ally Financial, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Cournoyer, Kelly) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Settlement as to Trans Union, LLC by Mohammed U Nawaz (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer: The deadline for Defendant Equifax Information Services, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 07/31/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 06/28/2023. (JD) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Brownstein, Boris) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Brownstein, Boris) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Brownstein on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Brownstein, Boris) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer: The deadline for Defendant Ally Financial, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 07/31/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 06/27/2023. (JD) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (RC) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held on 09/14/2023 at 11:00AM in Courtroom 504 North before Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. All counsel must attend.Counsel are directed to review the attached Initial Conference Order and this Court's Individual Practice Rules for instructions. By 09/07/2023, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the attached Proposed Discovery Plan (also available in PDF format at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/local_rules/ProposedDiscoveryPlanMMH.pdf). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 06/12/2023.(Attachments: #1 Individual Practice Rules, #2 Proposed Discovery Plan) (RC) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed U Nawaz. Ally Financial, Inc. served on 6/8/2023, answer due 6/29/2023. (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed U Nawaz. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 6/8/2023, answer due 6/29/2023. (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed U Nawaz. Trans Union, LLC served on 6/8/2023, answer due 6/29/2023. (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Ally Financial, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC. (KD) (Entered: 06/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) (Entered: 06/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) (Entered: 06/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD) (Entered: 06/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ally Financial, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16758153 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Mohammed U Nawaz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less