This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/21/2023 at 16:07:46 (UTC).

CASTELLO v. JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2023 CASTELLO filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian R. Martinotti and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-07341

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KATHLEEN CASTELLO

Defendants

JANSSEN ORTHO LLC

ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY

TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC

JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC.

ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC

JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC

In Re

ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JODY L. RODENBERG

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14562639), filed by KATHLEEN CASTELLO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RODENBERG, JODY) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (krg, ) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

3 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

 

Docket Entries

10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY on behalf of JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketMember Case Direct File on 8/22/2023, for MDL 2973 ELMIRON (PENTOSAN POLYSULFATE SODIUM) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (krg, ) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketThis case is part of MDL2973. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found #Here (krg, ) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC f/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC. f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC f/k/a JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY, ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (krg, ) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14562639), filed by KATHLEEN CASTELLO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RODENBERG, JODY) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less