This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2023 at 09:06:06 (UTC).

KIRK v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 KIRK filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN F MURPHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01854

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN F MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAULA KIRK

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARIA K. MCGINTY-FERRIS

BRANDON A. SWARTZ

Defendant Attorney

KATHERINE COLE DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Paul Knauer ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16693250.), filed by Paula Kirk.(SWARTZ, BRANDON) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MARIA K. MCGINTY-FERRIS on behalf of Paula Kirk (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/17/23 (bw) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by PAULA KIRK re #1 Complaint (Attorney) (Attachments: #1 Designation Form)(MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

4 #1

Designation Form

#5

(#5) NOTICE by PAULA KIRK re #1 Complaint (Attorney), Attorney Required Forms, (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by PAULA KIRK (SWARTZ, BRANDON) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Yaiza Franco re: served Complaint upon State Farm Insurance Company by Certified Mail on 5/23/2023 (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA) Modified on 6/5/2023 (kc). (Entered: 05/23/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE COLE DOUGLAS on behalf of STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE UNDERSIGNED COUNSEL, MARIA K.MCGINTY-FERRIS, ESQUIRE, ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF, PAULA KIRK AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF PAUL KNAUER, DECEASED, AND KATHERINE COLE DOUGLAS, ESQUIRE, ON BEHALF DEFENDANT, STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY, HEREBY STIPULATE AND AGREE THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED THIRTY (30) DAYS OR UNTIL JULY 13, 2023 SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 6/14/23. 6/14/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION TO AMEND CAPTION AND COMPLAINT by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE CAPTION IS AMENDED TO NAME THE DEFENDANT PROPERLY AS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AND THAT ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY SHALL PROPERLY REFERENCE STATE FARM IN THAT FASHION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 6/27/23. 6/27/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) Modified on 6/28/2023 (bw). (Entered: 06/28/2023)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

#14

(#14) ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SET FOR 8/16/2023 02:00 PM via Video Conference BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 7/14/23. 7/14/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SET FOR 8/16/2023 02:00 PM via Video Conference BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 7/14/23. 7/14/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE CAPTION IS AMENDED TO NAME THE DEFENDANT PROPERLY AS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AND THAT ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY SHALL PROPERLY REFERENCE STATE FARM IN THAT FASHION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 6/27/23. 6/27/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) Modified on 6/28/2023 (bw). (Entered: 06/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION TO AMEND CAPTION AND COMPLAINT by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE UNDERSIGNED COUNSEL, MARIA K.MCGINTY-FERRIS, ESQUIRE, ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF, PAULA KIRK AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF PAUL KNAUER, DECEASED, AND KATHERINE COLE DOUGLAS, ESQUIRE, ON BEHALF DEFENDANT, STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY, HEREBY STIPULATE AND AGREE THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED THIRTY (30) DAYS OR UNTIL JULY 13, 2023 SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 6/14/23. 6/14/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE COLE DOUGLAS on behalf of STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Yaiza Franco re: served Complaint upon State Farm Insurance Company by Certified Mail on 5/23/2023 (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA) Modified on 6/5/2023 (kc). (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by PAULA KIRK (SWARTZ, BRANDON) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by PAULA KIRK re #1 Complaint (Attorney), Attorney Required Forms, (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by PAULA KIRK re #1 Complaint (Attorney) (Attachments: #1 Designation Form)(MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/17/23 (bw) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketAttorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED CIVIL COVER SHEET in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Signature is missing. (sbt) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MARIA K. MCGINTY-FERRIS on behalf of Paula Kirk (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Paul Knauer ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16693250.), filed by Paula Kirk.(SWARTZ, BRANDON) (Entered: 05/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less