This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/23/2023 at 08:09:05 (UTC).

White-Lett v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated (MERS) et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 White-Lett filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated MERS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William M. Ray, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02327

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Ray, II

 

Party Details

Appellant

Shirley White-Lett

Debtor

Shirley Lett

Appellees

Federal National Mortgage Association

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated (MERS)

Merscorp Holdings, Inc. doing business as MERS

The Bank of New York Mellon

The Bank of New York Mellon Corp.

Fannie Mae

Bank of America, N.A.

RRA CP Opportunity Trust 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

John Dale Andrle

Chandler Thompson

Alan Michael Hurst

Jeremy Patrick Burnette

Brian Kenneth Jordan

Christine Kapur

Jennifer R. Burbine

William Oxford Tate

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Appellant's BRIEF by Shirley White-Lett. (dnb) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellant's Brief due by 7/27/2023. Appellee's Brief due by 8/28/2023. Appellant's Reply Brief due by 9/11/2023.(tas) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

6 #16

doc #263

6 #15

doc #261

6 #14

doc #249

6 #13

doc #247

6 #11

doc #165

6 #10

doc #164

6 #9

doc #163

6 #8

doc #160

6 #7

doc #159

6 #6

doc #158

6 #5

doc #157

6 #4

doc #155

6 #3

doc #154

6 #2

doc #153

6 #1

doc #148

#6

(#6) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED - Part III (Attachments: #1 doc #148, #2 doc #153, #3 doc #154, #4 doc #155, #5 doc #157, #6 doc #158, #7 doc #159, #8 doc #160, #9 doc #163, #10 doc #164, #11 doc #165, #12 doc #166, #13 doc #247, #14 doc #249, #15 doc #261, #16 doc #263) (Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Appellant's BRIEF by Shirley White-Lett. (dnb) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Shirley White-Lett re #7 Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule. (tas) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellant's Brief due by 7/27/2023. Appellee's Brief due by 8/28/2023. Appellant's Reply Brief due by 9/11/2023.(tas) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED - Part III (Attachments: #1 doc #148, #2 doc #153, #3 doc #154, #4 doc #155, #5 doc #157, #6 doc #158, #7 doc #159, #8 doc #160, #9 doc #163, #10 doc #164, #11 doc #165, #12 doc #166, #13 doc #247, #14 doc #249, #15 doc #261, #16 doc #263) (Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED - Part II (Attachments: #1 doc #70, #2 doc #71, #3 doc #72, #4 doc #73 (1-300), #5 doc #73 (301-600), #6 doc #73 (601-885), #7 doc #77, #8 doc #79, #9 doc #80, #10 doc #85, #11 doc #90, #12 doc #95, #13 doc #99, #14 doc #102, #15 doc #103, #16 doc #110, #17 doc #121, #18 doc #125, #19 doc #129, #20 doc #130, #21 doc #133, #22 doc #136, #23 doc #137, #24 doc #145) (Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED - Part I (Attachments: #1 doc #9, #2 doc #15, #3 doc #25, #4 doc #28, #5 doc #29, #6 doc #32, #7 doc #33, #8 doc #42, #9 doc #43, #10 doc #49, #11 doc #53, #12 doc #54, #13 doc #59, #14 doc #66, #15 doc #67, #16 doc #68 (1-300), #17 doc #68 (301-600), #18 doc #68 (601-885)) (Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting (by docket entry only) #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Viceof Alan M. Hurst. Ordered by Judge William M. Ray, II on 6/21/23. (sll) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Alan M. Hurst Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12651223) Attorney Alan Michael Hurst added appearing on behalf of Merscorp Holdings, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated (MERS), The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corp. (djs) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION for Admission of Alan M. Hurst Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12651223).by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated (MERS). (Burnette, Jeremy) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Alan Michael Hurst. Clerk to follow-up by 6/12/2023. (kkh) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid: $ 298.00, receipt number 1271676 paid in Bankruptcy Court. (tas) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal for Fee determination, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (dnb) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 10-61451-bem, ADV case#: 20-6278. Notice of Appeal filed 05/23/2023 from Order entered 05/10/2023 by Appellant Shirley White-Lett. Fee Paid: No. filed by Shirley White-Lett. (Attachments: #1 Submission Sheet, #2 NOA doc #254, #3 Appealed Order doc #252, #4 Docket sheet)(dnb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less