This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2023 at 10:14:14 (UTC).

Richartz et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2023 Richartz filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce E. Reinhart and Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:23-CV-81118

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paul Richartz

Linda Richartz

Defendants

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

Pfizer Inc

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc

GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.

Patheon Manufacturing Service LLC

L Perrigo Co.

Perrigo Company

Perrigo Research & Development Company

Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.

Dr. Reddy's Laboratories LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vincent Cheng

Defendant Attorneys

Mark K. Silver

Timothy Ignatius Duffy

Liza M. Walsh

Caroline Power

Christopher R. Carton

John Christie McMeekin, II

April Campos

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number MID-L-005126-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14431501), filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2, #5 Exhibit 3 - Part 3, #6 Exhibit 3 - Part 4, #7 Exhibit 3 - Part 5, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Part 1

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Part 2

1 #5

Exhibit 3 - Part 3

1 #6

Exhibit 3 - Part 4

1 #7

Exhibit 3 - Part 5

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY IGNATIUS DUFFY on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation (DUFFY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by VINCENT CHENG on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CHENG, VINCENT) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

#5

(#5) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-118) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida. (jjc, ) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:23-cv-03584. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jas). (Entered: 08/04/2023)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#9

(#9) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. The above-styled cases, 23-cv-81118, 23-cv-81121, and 23-cv-81122 are consolidated in MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924 for all pretrial purposes, and the parties are directed to submit all filings in the MDL action. 23-cv-81118, 23-cv-81121, and 23-cv-81122 are Administratively Closed. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/22/2023. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER Dismissing Case With Prejudice. Granting 6945 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice 6642 Order Brand Defendants Consolidated MOTION in Response to PTO 84, filed in case 20-md-2924. Cases 3:23-cv-23061, 3:23-cv-23062, 3:23-cv-23063, 3:23-cv-23064, 3:23-cv-23065, 3:23-cv-23066, 3:23-cv-23067, 3:23-cv-23068, 3:23-cv-23069, 3:23-cv-23070, 23-cv-23071, 3:23-cv-23076, 23-cv-23077, 3:23-cv-23084, 3:23-cv-23085, 3:23-cv-23088, 3:23-cv-23089, 3:23-cv-23090, 3:23-cv-23091, 3:23-cv-81118, 9:23-cv-81121, 9:23-cv-81122, 3:23-cv-23056, 3:23-cv-80956 are all Dismissed with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/19/2023. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. The above-styled cases, 23-cv-81118, 23-cv-81121, and 23-cv-81122 are consolidated in MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924 for all pretrial purposes, and the parties are directed to submit all filings in the MDL action. 23-cv-81118, 23-cv-81121, and 23-cv-81122 are Administratively Closed. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/22/2023. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

Docket(#8) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of District of New Jersey. Case Number 3:23-cv-03584 with documents 1-5. Assigned FLSD Case Number 23-cv-81118. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 20-md-2924. Clerks Note: JPML notified. (jas) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

Docket(#7) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (jas) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:23-cv-03584. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jas). (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-118) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida. (jjc, ) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by VINCENT CHENG on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CHENG, VINCENT) (Entered: 07/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: All defendants were not added to the docket. When entering parties make sure to add ALL PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS as found on the original state court complaint. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by parties and intervenors in diversity actions to identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Such disclosure statements must be filed with the parties, intervenors or proposed intervenors first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response or other request addressed to the Court. (kht) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (kht) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY IGNATIUS DUFFY on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation (DUFFY, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number MID-L-005126-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14431501), filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2, #5 Exhibit 3 - Part 3, #6 Exhibit 3 - Part 4, #7 Exhibit 3 - Part 5, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(SILVER, MARK) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less