This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2023 at 07:02:44 (UTC).

Mendez v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Mendez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00640

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAROLYN MENDEZ

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arthur Steven Ried

Defendant Attorney

Gregory J. Peterson

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-17459732), filed by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

2 #1

Supplement

2 #2

Supplement

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF COUNSEL OF RECORD by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF GREGORY J. PETERSON AS ATTORNEY IN CHARGE by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ENTITIES WITH A FINANCIAL INTEREST IN THIS LITIGATION by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF RELATED LITIGATION AND AFFECTED NON-PARTIES by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#8

(#8) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal JS044 CIVIL COVER SHEET by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER AND ADVISORY--It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed.R.Civ.P 26(f) and Local Court Rule CV-16(c) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent, under 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (nm) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Settlement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Settlement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 06/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER AND ADVISORY--It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed.R.Civ.P 26(f) and Local Court Rule CV-16(c) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent, under 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (nm) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (nm) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (nm) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal JS044 CIVIL COVER SHEET by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF RELATED LITIGATION AND AFFECTED NON-PARTIES by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ENTITIES WITH A FINANCIAL INTEREST IN THIS LITIGATION by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF GREGORY J. PETERSON AS ATTORNEY IN CHARGE by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF COUNSEL OF RECORD by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-17459732), filed by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less