This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 09:57:39 (UTC).

Jackson v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 Jackson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-06880

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawn Jackson

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Synchrony Bank

Client Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Levi Y. Eidelman

Defendant Attorneys

April M. Johnson

Nicole Camacho

Adam Theodore Hill

Boris Brownstein

Ofunne Edoziem

Brendan Hoffman Little

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) Letter in Response to Order to Show Cause by Shawn Jackson (Eidelman, Levi) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

31 #1

Certificate of Service

#31

(#31) Letter as a supplement to the Joint Letter in Connection with the Initial Status Conference (NYSCEF Doc. No. 24) by Synchrony Bank (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Edoziem, Ofunne) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

#30

(#30) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION for pre motion conference seeking permission to make a motion to dismiss filed by Client Services, Inc.. (Little, Brendan) (Entered: 10/31/2023)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Settlement as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Shawn Jackson (Eidelman, Levi) (Entered: 10/31/2023)

#28

(#28) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Camacho, Nicole) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

#27

(#27) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint Plan) (Eidelman, Levi) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by April M. Johnson on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Johnson, April) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

#13

(#30) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION for pre motion conference seeking permission to make a motion to dismiss filed by Client Services, Inc.. (Little, Brendan) (Entered: 10/31/2023)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 11/1/2023 at 10:00 am. The parties are directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 642046966#. See attached mandatory requirements for the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/20/2023. (PW) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. Re Quality Control Check - Summons, by Shawn Jackson (Eidelman, Levi) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (AF) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#25) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Hill, Adam) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) Letter in Response to Order to Show Cause by Shawn Jackson (Eidelman, Levi) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER denying #13 motion to dismiss. See Vangorden v. Second Round, Limited Partnership, 897 F.3d 433 (2d Cir. 2018). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/8/2023. (PW) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

DocketMinute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/1/2023. Plaintiff, Experian, Equifax, and Synchrony Bank appeared via telephone. No appearance by Client Services, Inc. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by 11/8/2023 why the complaint should not be dismissed for lack of standing. Discovery will proceed with fact discovery to end 1/31/2024. (PW) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) Letter as a supplement to the Joint Letter in Connection with the Initial Status Conference (NYSCEF Doc. No. 24) by Synchrony Bank (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Edoziem, Ofunne) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION for pre motion conference seeking permission to make a motion to dismiss filed by Client Services, Inc.. (Little, Brendan) (Entered: 10/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) NOTICE of Settlement as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Shawn Jackson (Eidelman, Levi) (Entered: 10/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Camacho, Nicole) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint Plan) (Eidelman, Levi) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by April M. Johnson on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Johnson, April) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Hill, Adam) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Jackson. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 9/25/2023, answer due 10/16/2023. (Eidelman, Levi) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Jackson. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/22/2023, answer due 10/13/2023. (Eidelman, Levi) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Jackson. Client Services, Inc. served on 9/22/2023, answer due 10/13/2023. (Eidelman, Levi) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Client Services, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Synchrony Bank. (RG) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 11/1/2023 at 10:00 am. The parties are directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 642046966#. See attached mandatory requirements for the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/20/2023. (PW) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. Re Quality Control Check - Summons, by Shawn Jackson (Eidelman, Levi) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketYour proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must be a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included in one (1) proposed summons. Also, the clerk of court name needs to be updated/corrected. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (AF) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (AF) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AF) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Client Services, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Synchrony Bank filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17090938 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Shawn Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (Eidelman, Levi) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less