This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/19/2023 at 07:11:54 (UTC).

Starstone National Insurance Company v. Kinsale Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2023 Starstone National Insurance Company filed an Other lawsuit against Kinsale Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-08074

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Starstone National Insurance Company

Torus National Insurance Company

Defendants

Kinsale Insurance Company

Burlington Insurance Company

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg PA

Unknown Parties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Adam Dessaules

Thomas Edward Raccuia

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley Lynn Dunn

Megha Singh

Jay Graif

Lorne Grant Hiller

Megan Elizabeth Ritenour

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Dunn, Bradley) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

22 #1

Exhibit A

#22

(#22) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dunn, Bradley) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

#21

(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Burlington Insurance Company. (Graif, Jay) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to Complaint by Burlington Insurance Company.(Graif, Jay) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

#19

(#19) ORDER pursuant to the #15 Stipulation For Extension, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED extending the time for Defendant Kinsale Insurance Company to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint to June 7, 2023. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/30/2023. (ESG) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Starstone National Insurance Company. Party GNM Companies LLC (an Arizona limited liability company) terminated. (Raccuia, Thomas) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

15 #1

Proposed Order granting extension of time for Kinsale to file Responsive Pleadin

#15

(#15) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting extension of time for Kinsale to file Responsive Pleading)(Dunn, Bradley) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

5 #3

Summons

5 #2

Summons

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Starstone National Insurance Company. (REM) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21830422. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-08074-PCT-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

2 #3

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

2 #2

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Dunn, Bradley) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dunn, Bradley) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Lorne Grant Hiller on behalf of Defendant Burlington Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Burlington Insurance Company. (Graif, Jay) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to Complaint by Burlington Insurance Company.(Graif, Jay) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER pursuant to the #15 Stipulation For Extension, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED extending the time for Defendant Kinsale Insurance Company to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint to June 7, 2023. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/30/2023. (ESG) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Starstone National Insurance Company. Party GNM Companies LLC (an Arizona limited liability company) terminated. (Raccuia, Thomas) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Edward Raccuia on behalf of Starstone National Insurance Company. (Raccuia, Thomas) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Starstone National Insurance Company: Certificate of Service re: Summons; Complaint; Notice of Avail of Judge; Order for Prelim Policies and Corporate Disclosure Statement upon National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg PA on May 22, 2023. (Dessaules, Jonathan) Modified per help desk call on 5/26/2023 (WLP). (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting extension of time for Kinsale to file Responsive Pleading)(Dunn, Bradley) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Starstone National Insurance Company: Certificate of Service re: Summons; Complaint; Notice of Avail of Judge; Order for Prelim Policies and Corporate Disclosure Statement upon The Burlington Insurance Company on May 8, 2023. (Imperi, Douglas) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Starstone National Insurance Company: Certificate of Service re: Summons; Complaint; Notice of Avail of Judge; Order for Prelim Policies and Corporate Disclosure Statement upon National Union Fire Insurance Company on May 8, 2023. (Imperi, Douglas) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Starstone National Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent StarStone Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent StarStone US Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Core Specialty Insurance Holding, Inc. for Starstone National Insurance Company. (Dessaules, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on July 19, 2023. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/21/2023. (ESG) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER This matter having recently come before this Court, the parties are advised of the following preliminary policies and procedures that will govern these proceedings and are ordered as follows. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/21/2023. (ESG) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Burlington Insurance Company, GNM Companies LLC, Kinsale Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg PA. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Starstone National Insurance Company. (REM) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21830422. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-08074-PCT-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Starstone National Insurance Company. (Dessaules, Jonathan) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(REM) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21830422 filed by Starstone National Insurance Company. (Dessaules, Jonathan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less