This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2023 at 11:40:57 (UTC).

Owens v. Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2023 Owens filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Geraghty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-04209

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Geraghty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephon Owens

Defendants

Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.

Titus Transport Holdings, LLC

Richard McConkey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Thomas Cox

Matthew Q. Wetherington

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Stephon Owens.(Cox, James) (Entered: 11/15/2023)

10 #2

Exhibit 2023-10-10 - Attachment C - Initial Document List.SOWENS

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Richard McConkey, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Titus Transport Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NEAT Enterprisesl, LLC for Titus Transport Holdings, LLC; Corporate Parent Ryder System, Inc. for Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. (Arndt, Patrick) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 9/29/2023. (sap) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER of State Court of Cobb County re: Granting Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Amend the Pleadings to Correct Misnomer. (Filed 8/2/23 in State Court of Cobb County and included with Notice of Removal) (dnb) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER of State Court of Cobb County re: Dismissing UM Carrier. (Filed 8/2/23 in State Court of Cobb County and included with Notice of Removal) (dnb) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, CROSSCLAIM against Richard McConkey by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Filed 6/14/23 in State Court of Cobb County and included with Notice of Removal)(dnb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Titus Transport Holdings, LLC.(Filed 7/5/2023 in State Court of Cobb County and included with Notice of Removal)(dnb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Richard McConkey. (Filed 6/30/2023 in State Court of Cobb County and included with Notice of Removal)(dnb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Filed 6/7/2023 in State Court of Cobb County and included with Notice of Removal) Discovery ends on 2/15/2024.(dnb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/20/2023)

1 #31

Exhibit Answer Crossclaim of USAA

1 #24

Exhibit Consent Motion & Agmt for Dismissal

1 #22

Exhibit Rule 5.2 COS (Roggs & RPDs to Pl & Def)

1 #17

Exhibit Rule 5.2 COS (Plf's 1st Roggs, RPDs and RFAs to McConkey)

1 #13

Exhibit AOS re Ryder-c

1 #7

Exhibit Plf's Resp to Titus's RFAs

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint

#1

(#14) Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.(Arndt, Patrick) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 10/12/2023 to correct filers (ane). (Entered: 10/11/2023)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Stephon Owens.(Cox, James) (Entered: 11/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotification of Docket Correction re #19 Answer, #20 Answer, #21 Answer. Modified to link Docket entries to the #1 Complaint. (ane) (Entered: 11/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) Second Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.(Arndt, Patrick) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 11/13/2023 to correct filer and docket text (ane). (Entered: 11/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) Second Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint Titus Transport Holdings, LLC.(Arndt, Patrick) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 11/13/2023 to correct filers and docket text (ane). (Entered: 11/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) Second Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Richard McConkey.(Arndt, Patrick) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 11/13/2023 to correct filers (ane). (Entered: 11/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #17 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Amended Pleadings due by 11/10/2023. Discovery ends on 4/18/2024. Parties shall mediate the case no later than 1/19/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 5/20/2024. If no dispositive motions are filed, Daubert motions and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/20/2024. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 10/17/2023. (ane) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Stephon Owens. (Cox, James) (Entered: 10/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Richard McConkey.(Arndt, Patrick) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 10/12/2023 to correct filers(ane). (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Titus Transport Holdings, LLC.(Arndt, Patrick) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 10/12/2023 to correct filers(ane). (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.(Arndt, Patrick) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 10/12/2023 to correct filers (ane). (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Initial Disclosures by Stephon Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2023-10-10 - Attachment A - Witness List.SOWENS, #2 Exhibit 2023-10-10 - Attachment C - Initial Document List.SOWENS, #3 Exhibit 2023-10-10 - Attachment D - Documents Relating to Damages.SOWENS, #4 Exhibit 2023-10-10 - Attachment E - Documents Relating to Insurance.SOWENS)(Cox, James) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Richard McConkey, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Titus Transport Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NEAT Enterprisesl, LLC for Titus Transport Holdings, LLC; Corporate Parent Ryder System, Inc. for Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. (Arndt, Patrick) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 9/29/2023. (sap) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER of State Court of Cobb County re: Granting Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Amend the Pleadings to Correct Misnomer. (Filed 8/2/23 in State Court of Cobb County and included with Notice of Removal) (dnb) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER of State Court of Cobb County re: Dismissing UM Carrier. (Filed 8/2/23 in State Court of Cobb County and included with Notice of Removal) (dnb) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, CROSSCLAIM against Richard McConkey by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Filed 6/14/23 in State Court of Cobb County and included with Notice of Removal)(dnb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Titus Transport Holdings, LLC.(Filed 7/5/2023 in State Court of Cobb County and included with Notice of Removal)(dnb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Richard McConkey. (Filed 6/30/2023 in State Court of Cobb County and included with Notice of Removal)(dnb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Filed 6/7/2023 in State Court of Cobb County and included with Notice of Removal) Discovery ends on 2/15/2024.(dnb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Titus Transport Holdings, LLC, Richard McConkey, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12892796) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B. AOS - USAA, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Order Dismissing UM Carrier, #4 Exhibit Ryder's Answer, #5 Exhibit McConkey's Answer, #6 Exhibit Titus's Answer, #7 Exhibit Plf's Resp to Titus's RFAs, #8 Exhibit Index of State Court Pleadings, #9 Exhibit State CourtCivil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit Summons to Titus Transport, #11 Exhibit Summons to Ryder Truck Rental, #12 Exhibit Summons to Richard McConkey, #13 Exhibit AOS re Ryder-c, #14 Exhibit Rule 5.2 COS, #15 Exhibit Summons to USAA Gen. Ind. Co., #16 Exhibit AOS re McConkey-c, #17 Exhibit Rule 5.2 COS (Plf's 1st Roggs, RPDs and RFAs to McConkey), #18 Exhibit Titus AOS, #19 Exhibit Rule 5.2 COS (Plf's 1st Roggs, RPDs and RFAs to Titus), #20 Exhibit LOA 2023 - SHW, #21 Exhibit Jury Demand, #22 Exhibit Rule 5.2 COS (Roggs & RPDs to Pl & Def), #23 Exhibit Plf's Consent Motion to Amend Pldg, #24 Exhibit Consent Motion & Agmt for Dismissal, #25 Exhibit Rule 5.2 COS (Titus' 1st Roggs, RPDs and RFAs), #26 Exhibit Civil Case Disp. Form, #27 Exhibit Def's Discovery Resp., #28 Exhibit Order Granting Consent Motion, #29 Exhibit Rule 5.2 COS (Plf's Resp. to Titus' 1st Roggs & RPDs), #30 Exhibit Rule 5.2 COS (Offer of Settlement), #31 Exhibit Answer Crossclaim of USAA, #32 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (State Court), #33 Civil Cover Sheet)(dnb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less