This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/30/2023 at 07:36:56 (UTC).

Alvares v. McGinnis et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2023 Alvares filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against McGinnis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Eleanor L. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01986

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shahaney Alvares

Defendants

Benjamin McGinnis

Moeller Trucking, Inc.

Arch Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth Paul Raley, III

Defendant Attorneys

James E. Gilson

David Carducci

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 6/26/23 through 6/30/23, 7/5/23 through 7/10/23, 8/15/23 through 8/21/23, 9/5/23 through 9/11/23, by James E. Gilson. (Gilson, James) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Moeller Trucking, Inc..(Gilson, James) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

#12

(#12) NOTICE by Shahaney Alvares Change of Address (Raley, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan: Per the Parties' request, the fact discovery period will last for six (6) months, beginning on June 7, 2023, and closing on December 7, 2023. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 5/31/23. (ceo) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

10 #5

Exhibit Attachment E

10 #4

Exhibit Attachment D

10 #3

Exhibit Attachment C

10 #2

Exhibit Attachment B

10 #1

Exhibit Attachment A

10 #10

Main Document

9 #7

Exhibit Insurance Declaration Pages

9 #6

Exhibit Plaintiff's Medical Bills

9 #5

Exhibit Cont. Documents to Support Claims

9 #4

Exhibit Cont. Documents to Support Claims

9 #2

Exhibit Expert Witness List

9 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's Witness List

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Benjamin McGinnis, Moeller Trucking, Inc., USAA General Indemnity Company. (Gilson, James) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 6/26/23 through 6/30/23, 7/5/23 through 7/10/23, 8/15/23 through 8/21/23, 9/5/23 through 9/11/23, by James E. Gilson. (Gilson, James) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Moeller Trucking, Inc..(Gilson, James) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by Shahaney Alvares Change of Address (Raley, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan: Per the Parties' request, the fact discovery period will last for six (6) months, beginning on June 7, 2023, and closing on December 7, 2023. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 5/31/23. (ceo) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Initial Disclosures by Benjamin McGinnis, Moeller Trucking Inc, and Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment B, #3 Exhibit Attachment C, #4 Exhibit Attachment D, #5 Exhibit Attachment E)(Gilson, James) Modified on 6/1/2023 to edit text (dnb). (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First Initial Disclosures by Shahaney Alvares. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Witness List, #2 Exhibit Expert Witness List, #3 Exhibit Documents to Support Claims, #4 Exhibit Cont. Documents to Support Claims, #5 Exhibit Cont. Documents to Support Claims, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Medical Bills, #7 Exhibit Insurance Declaration Pages)(Raley, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Benjamin McGinnis, Moeller Trucking, Inc., USAA General Indemnity Company. (Gilson, James) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group Ltd & Other Affiliate Arch Reinsurance Company for Arch Insurance Company. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction re: #7 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. The docket has been corrected by adding the Corporate Parent and Other Affiliates listed in the filing. (pdt) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group Ltd & Other Affiliate Arch Reinsurance Company for Arch Insurance Company. Filed by Arch Insurance Company, Benjamin McGinnis, & Moeller Trucking, Inc.. (Gilson, James) (pdt). (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #6 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) as to Defendants Arch Insurance Group, Inc., and Arch Insurance Solutions, Inc., ONLY (ceo) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Less Than All Defendants by Arch Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Group, Inc., Arch Insurance Solutions, Inc., Benjamin McGinnis, Moeller Trucking, Inc.. (Gilson, James) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arch Insurance Company.(Gilson, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Moeller Trucking, Inc..(Gilson, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Benjamin McGinnis. Discovery ends on 10/5/2023.(Gilson, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Moeller Trucking, Inc., Benjamin McGinnis, Arch Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Group, Inc., Arch Insurance Solutions, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CGANDC-12569630) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint & Summons, #2 Exhibit B: Henry County State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C: Declaration of David Carducci, #4 Exhibit D: Notice of Removal Filed in Henry County State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(pdt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less