This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2023 at 07:54:18 (UTC).

Wagner v. Boehringer Ingelheim et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2023 Wagner filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-23048

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa L. Wagner

Defendants

Boehringer Ingelheim

Chattem Inc.

Patheon Manufacturing Service, LLC

Sanofi

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. In light of the consolidation of all cases in the MDL action, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Clerk of the Court shall mark this case as CLOSED for administrative purposes only. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/24/2023. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

#3

(#3) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 4/12/2023 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS267857. (vt) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

 

Docket Entries

04/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. In light of the consolidation of all cases in the MDL action, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Clerk of the Court shall mark this case as CLOSED for administrative purposes only. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/24/2023. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 4/12/2023 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS267857. (vt) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

Docket(#2) MDL 2924 Judge Assignment with Tag-Along Case Receipt from the Southern District of Florida. Judge Robin L. Rosenberg assigned FLSD Case Number 3:23-cv-23048. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-MD-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified. (pes) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim, Chattem Inc., Patheon Manufacturing Service, LLC, Sanofi. Filing fees $ 402.00, filed by Lisa L. Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pes) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less