This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/03/2023 at 07:53:35 (UTC).

Geneva Rock Products, Inc. v. QBE Insurance

Case Summary

On 07/05/2023 Geneva Rock Products, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against QBE Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale A. Kimball and Daphne A. Oberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00424

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Kimball

Referral Judge

Daphne A. Oberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Geneva Rock Products, Inc.

Defendant

QBE Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan C. Bradshaw

Carson Fuller

Matthew David Church

Defendant Attorneys

Heidi G. Goebel

Andrew L. Margulis

Tehila N. Colman

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) DISCOVERY MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/9/2023. (eat) (Entered: 08/09/2023)

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER granting #14 Motion for Scheduling Order. Amended Pleadings due by 9/29/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 9/29/2023. Expert Discovery due by 4/19/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 5/3/2024. See Order for additional details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/9/2023. (eat) (Entered: 08/09/2023)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order

#14

(#14) MOTION for Scheduling Order/REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Bradshaw, Alan) Modified by changing event type to motion for scheduling order and correcting docket text on 8/8/2023 (eat). (Entered: 08/08/2023)

#13

(#13) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/7/2023. (eat) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by QBE Insurance.(Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant QBE Insurance identifying QBE Insurance Group Limited as Corporate Parent. (Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tehila N. Colman for QBE Insurance.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from the court's web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/6/2023. (eat) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew L. Margulis for QBE Insurance.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from the court's web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/6/2023. (eat) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

7 #1

Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice

#7

(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tehila N. Colman , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4734069,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant QBE Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

6 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

6 #1

Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice

#6

(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew L. Margulis , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4734065,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant QBE Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice mailed to attorney Andrew L Margulis for QBE Insurance. (ks) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Geneva Rock Products, Inc., Defendant QBE Insurance. (ks) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Geneva Rock Products, Inc., Defendant QBE Insurance. (Notice generated by Court) Form due by 7/26/2023. (ks) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) DISCOVERY MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/9/2023. (eat) (Entered: 08/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER granting #14 Motion for Scheduling Order. Amended Pleadings due by 9/29/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 9/29/2023. Expert Discovery due by 4/19/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 5/3/2024. See Order for additional details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/9/2023. (eat) (Entered: 08/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) MOTION REFERRED - #14 MOTION for Scheduling Order referred to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. (eat) (Entered: 08/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) MOTION for Scheduling Order/REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Bradshaw, Alan) Modified by changing event type to motion for scheduling order and correcting docket text on 8/8/2023 (eat). (Entered: 08/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/7/2023. (eat) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by QBE Insurance.(Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant QBE Insurance identifying QBE Insurance Group Limited as Corporate Parent. (Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tehila N. Colman for QBE Insurance.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from the court's web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/6/2023. (eat) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew L. Margulis for QBE Insurance.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utah's local rules from the court's web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/6/2023. (eat) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

Docket(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 7/6/2023. (eat) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tehila N. Colman , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4734069,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant QBE Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew L. Margulis , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4734065,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant QBE Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice mailed to attorney Andrew L Margulis for QBE Insurance. (ks) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Geneva Rock Products, Inc., Defendant QBE Insurance. (ks) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Geneva Rock Products, Inc., Defendant QBE Insurance. (Notice generated by Court) Form due by 7/26/2023. (ks) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Salt Lake County, case number 230903608, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4733876) filed by QBE Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Defendant QBE Insurance is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (ks) (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less