This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2023 at 09:05:53 (UTC).

Akers v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/13/2023 Akers filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Kane and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02390

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Kane

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jorel Akers

Defendant

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laurence Michael Schneider

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Kirsten Wagner

Alexandra Lee Robertson

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/18/2023. (cthom, ) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

#14

(#14) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2023. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

#13

(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Robertson, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

#12

(#12) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Robertson, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Robertson, Alexandra) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/15/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/11/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2023 at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/14/023. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02390-JLK-MEH (angar, ) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#8

(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (efoga, ) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Laurence Michael Schneider on behalf of Jorel AkersAttorney Laurence Michael Schneider added to party Jorel Akers(pty:pla) (Schneider, Laurence) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint and Jury Demand, Delay Reduction Order and Division 15 Delay Reduction Order, and Order Regarding Plan for Settlement upon Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company on 8/23/2023 (efoga, ) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Jorel Akers.(efoga, ) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alexandra Lee Robertson on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Alexandra Lee Robertson added to party Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Robertson, Alexandra) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit C-Traffic Accident Report

1 #5

Exhibit A-State Court Summons

1 #2

Exhibit A-State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Complaint and Jury Demand

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/18/2023. (cthom, ) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2023. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Robertson, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Robertson, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Robertson, Alexandra) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/15/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/11/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2023 at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/14/023. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02390-JLK-MEH (angar, ) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (efoga, ) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Laurence Michael Schneider on behalf of Jorel AkersAttorney Laurence Michael Schneider added to party Jorel Akers(pty:pla) (Schneider, Laurence) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

Docket(#7) Case assigned to Judge John L. Kane and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint and Jury Demand, Delay Reduction Order and Division 15 Delay Reduction Order, and Order Regarding Plan for Settlement upon Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company on 8/23/2023 (efoga, ) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Jorel Akers.(efoga, ) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alexandra Lee Robertson on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Alexandra Lee Robertson added to party Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Robertson, Alexandra) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2023CV31366. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9293536), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-State Court Delay Reduction Order, #4 Exhibit A-State Court Delay Reduction Order and Order re: Plan for Settlement, #5 Exhibit A-State Court Summons, #6 Exhibit A-State Court Affidavit of Service, #7 Exhibit B-Voter Registration, #8 Exhibit C-Traffic Accident Report, #9 Exhibit D-Colorado Secretary of State Periodic Report, #10 Exhibit State Court Register of Actions, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less