This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2023 at 07:56:07 (UTC).

Isix IP LLC v. SAP America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 Isix IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against SAP America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00237

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Isix IP LLC

Defendant

SAP America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cabrach John Connor

Defendant Attorneys

Frank C Cimino, Jr

J Thad Heartfield

M. Dru Montgomery

Megan S Woodworth

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against SAP America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9521905.), filed by Isix IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#3

(#3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Isix IP LLC (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to SAP America, Inc.. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Isix IP LLC. SAP America, Inc. waiver sent on 6/1/2023, answer due 7/31/2023. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank C Cimino, Jr on behalf of SAP America, Inc. (Cimino, Frank) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan S Woodworth on behalf of SAP America, Inc. (Woodworth, Megan) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of SAP America, Inc. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of SAP America, Inc. (Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

 

Docket Entries

06/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of SAP America, Inc. (Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of SAP America, Inc. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan S Woodworth on behalf of SAP America, Inc. (Woodworth, Megan) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank C Cimino, Jr on behalf of SAP America, Inc. (Cimino, Frank) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Isix IP LLC. SAP America, Inc. waiver sent on 6/1/2023, answer due 7/31/2023. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to SAP America, Inc.. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (klc, ) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketDistrict Judge Rodney Gilstrap added. (klc, ) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Isix IP LLC (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against SAP America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9521905.), filed by Isix IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less