This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2023 at 06:44:23 (UTC).

Cobblestone Wireless, LLC v. AT&T Services Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2023 Cobblestone Wireless, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AT T Services Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00380

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cobblestone Wireless, LLC

Defendants

AT&T Services Inc.,

AT&T Mobility LLC

AT&T Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew D. Aichele

Neil Alan Rubin

Christian W Conkle

Jacob Buczko

Jason Wietholter

Amy Elizabeth Hayden

Jonathan Ma

Marc A Fenster

Qi Tong

Reza Mirzaie

Defendant Attorneys

Adam Bertram Ahnhut

David S Frist

Emily Chambers Welch

John Daniel Haynes

Sloane Sueanne Kyrazis

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:23-cv-00382. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for trial., Cases associated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/2/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

#17

(#17) Defendants' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc.,.( Ahnhut, Adam) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Qi Tong on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Tong, Qi) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil Alan Rubin on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Rubin, Neil) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D. Aichele on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Aichele, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Ma on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Buczko on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Buczko, Jacob) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Wietholter on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Wietholter, Jason) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

6 #2

Additional Attachment(s)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC re #1 Complaint NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

#2

(#2) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#5) NOTICE by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC re #1 Complaint NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:23-cv-00382. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for trial., Cases associated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/2/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Corp. to 11/3/2023; AT&T Mobility LLC to 11/3/2023; AT&T Services Inc., to 11/3/2023. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) Defendants' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc.,.( Ahnhut, Adam) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Qi Tong on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Tong, Qi) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil Alan Rubin on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Rubin, Neil) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D. Aichele on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Aichele, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Ma on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Buczko on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Buczko, Jacob) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Wietholter on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Wietholter, Jason) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Elizabeth Hayden on behalf of Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Hayden, Amy) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC. AT&T Corp. served on 8/29/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; AT&T Mobility LLC served on 8/29/2023, answer due 9/19/2023; AT&T Services Inc., served on 8/29/2023, answer due 9/19/2023. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Additional Attachment(s), #2 Additional Attachment(s))(klc, ) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (klc, ) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketDistrict Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne added. (klc, ) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC re #1 Complaint NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9673642.), filed by Cobblestone Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less