This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2023 at 08:11:55 (UTC).

Johnson v. Imery's Filtration Minerals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2023 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Imery's Filtration Minerals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00471

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Johnson

Defendants

Imery's Filtration Minerals, Inc.

Atlas Transport LLC

Ofelio Juventino Leal-Vasquez

Total Quality Logistics, LLC

Intervenor

Great Western Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard W. Hunnicutt, III

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Christopher Jordan

Bijan R. Siahatgar

Charles Hayes

Ericka I. Ramirez

Gregory J. Peterson

Stephen C. Haynes

Lea C. Dearing

Intervenor Attorney

Mark Andrew Solomon

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A: Report of Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, #2 Proposed Order)(Dearing, Lea) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

4 #1

Ex A: Report of Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration

4 #2

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION to Waive Judge Garcia's Civil Case Paragraph 36 Requirements by Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (Dearing, Lea) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b) and Rule 12(b)(6) by Imery's Filtration Minerals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Jordan, Mark) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

6 #1

Exhibit A

6 #2

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION to Waive Paragraph 36 of the Divisional Office Standing Order Entitled Court Fact Sheet for U.S. District Judge Orlando Garcia by Imery's Filtration Minerals, Inc.. (Jordan, Mark) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Continue RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Michael Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Bill of Ladling)(Henry, Thomas) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Bill of Ladling

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Atlas Transport LLC, Ofelio Juventino Leal-Vasquez. (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#10

(#10) Proposed Order to #9 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Atlas Transport LLC, Ofelio Juventino Leal-Vasquez. (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

 

Docket Entries

05/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Proposed Order to #9 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Atlas Transport LLC, Ofelio Juventino Leal-Vasquez. (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Atlas Transport LLC, Ofelio Juventino Leal-Vasquez. (Peterson, Gregory) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION to Continue RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Michael Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Bill of Ladling)(Henry, Thomas) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION to Waive Paragraph 36 of the Divisional Office Standing Order Entitled Court Fact Sheet for U.S. District Judge Orlando Garcia by Imery's Filtration Minerals, Inc.. (Jordan, Mark) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b) and Rule 12(b)(6) by Imery's Filtration Minerals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Jordan, Mark) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION to Waive Judge Garcia's Civil Case Paragraph 36 Requirements by Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (Dearing, Lea) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A: Report of Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, #2 Proposed Order)(Dearing, Lea) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketCase assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketSpoke via telephone with Filing attorney Bijan R. Siahatgar and he indicated this case was intended to be filed in the San Antonio division. (cr5) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

Docket***Civil case filed in Austin Division instead of the San Antonio Division. (pg) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (Dearing, Lea) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

Docket(#2) NOTICE Supplemental Notice of Removal by Total Quality Logistics, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Ex A: Affidavit of Service onTQL, #2 Ex B: Declaration of Marc Bostwick)(Dearing, Lea) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Imery's Filtration Minerals, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-17319645), filed by Imery's Filtration Minerals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit B - Original Petition, #5 Exhibit C - First Amd Petition, #6 Exhibit D - 2nd Amd Petition, #7 Exhibit E Leal-Vasquez Answer, #8 Exhibit F - Atlas Transport LLC Answer, #9 Exhibit G - Pet in Intervention, #10 Exhibit H - List of Counsel)(Siahatgar, Bijan) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less