This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2023 at 06:43:30 (UTC).

Bogert v. AT&T Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2023 Bogert filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against AT T Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen R. Bough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00563

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen R. Bough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matt Bogert

Defendants

AT&T Services, Inc.

AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George E. Kapke, Jr.

Andrew Schermerhorn

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Westering

Michael L. Blumenthal

Raymond A Kresge

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T Warnermedia Pension Benefit Plan filed by George E. Kapke, Jr on behalf of Matt Bogert. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8569502. Service due by 11/7/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kapke, George) (Entered: 08/09/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 08/09/2023)

2 #1

MAP General Order

#3

(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Matt Bogert. AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. (Kapke, George) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Matt Bogert. AT&T Services, Inc. served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. (Kapke, George) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Michael L. Blumenthal on behalf of Defendants AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan.(Attorney Michael L. Blumenthal added to party AT&T Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael L. Blumenthal added to party AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Blumenthal, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

#6

(#6) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Michael L. Blumenthal on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/14/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Blumenthal, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of appearance by Michael L. Blumenthal on behalf of All Defendants (Blumenthal, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of appearance by Matthew Westering on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Matthew Westering added to party AT&T Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Westering added to party AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Westering, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

#10

(#10) Second MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Matthew Westering on behalf of AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/28/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Westering, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan.(Blumenthal, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

#13

(#13) Motion to allow Raymond Kresge to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8658492) filed by Michael L. Blumenthal on behalf of AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan. (Blumenthal, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

#15

(#15) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/27/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 10/12/23 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/18/2023

DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/27/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 10/12/23 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Raymond A. Kresge for AT&T Services, Inc. and AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Motion to allow Raymond Kresge to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8658492) filed by Michael L. Blumenthal on behalf of AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan. (Blumenthal, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan.(Blumenthal, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

Docket(#11) Before the Court is Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. (Doc. #10.) Upon review, the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants may file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before October 6, 2023. Signed on 9/14/2023 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Borneman, Sara) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Second MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Matthew Westering on behalf of AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/28/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Westering, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

Docket(#9) Before the Court is Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. (Doc. #6.) Upon review, the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants may file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 22, 2023. Signed on 8/31/2023 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Murphy-Carr, Shauna) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of appearance by Matthew Westering on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Matthew Westering added to party AT&T Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Westering added to party AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Westering, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of appearance by Michael L. Blumenthal on behalf of All Defendants (Blumenthal, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Michael L. Blumenthal on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/14/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Blumenthal, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Michael L. Blumenthal on behalf of Defendants AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan.(Attorney Michael L. Blumenthal added to party AT&T Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael L. Blumenthal added to party AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Blumenthal, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Matt Bogert. AT&T Services, Inc. served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. (Kapke, George) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Matt Bogert. AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. (Kapke, George) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T WarnerMedia Pension Benefit Plan. (Kern, Kendra) (Entered: 08/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 08/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T Warnermedia Pension Benefit Plan filed by George E. Kapke, Jr on behalf of Matt Bogert. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8569502. Service due by 11/7/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kapke, George) (Entered: 08/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less