This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2023 at 08:03:08 (UTC).

Pearce v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 Pearce filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John R. Tunheim and Tony N. Leung. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-01302

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Tunheim

Referral Judge

Tony N. Leung

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Pearce

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zachary Schmoll

Blake R Bauer

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Keenan Ryan

Jessica P. Hutchinson

Margaret Ann Santos

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10266915) filed by Robert Pearce. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bauer, Blake) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (MMP) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10298252 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 5/11/2023, answer due 7/10/2023. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#9

(#9) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2023 at 01:00 PM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

10 #1

Consent Form

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Robert Pearce. (Bauer, Blake) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

#12

(#12) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Dismissal. (Bauer, Blake) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Dismissal. (Bauer, Blake) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Robert Pearce. (Bauer, Blake) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2023 at 01:00 PM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/25/2023. (jam) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 5/11/2023, answer due 7/10/2023. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10298252 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (MMP) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 23-cv-1302 (JRT/TNL).Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10266915) filed by Robert Pearce. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bauer, Blake) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less