This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 13:41:06 (UTC).

Nyamekye v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 Nyamekye filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against U S Immigration and Customs Enforcement. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew W. Brann and MP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-01541

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

Referral Judge

MP

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nathanael Nyamekye

Respondent

U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

George Michael Thiel

Joseph J Terz

Gerard T. Donahue

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (ea) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2023: #1 AO85 Notice and Consent Form) (ea). (Entered: 09/15/2023)

3 #1

AO85 Notice and Consent Form

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the petition is DEEMED FILED. The Clerk of Court is directed to to serve the petition #1 petition for writ of habeas corpus and this Order on Respondent and the United States Attorney. (See Order for further details) Show Cause Response due by 10/10/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 9/19/2023. (ea) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent's #8 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. Respondent may file their Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, which does not exceed 24 pages or 5,700 words, exclusive of tables and signature page. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 10/13/2023. (ea) (Entered: 10/13/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent's #8 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. Respondent may file their Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, which does not exceed 24 pages or 5,700 words, exclusive of tables and signature page. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 10/13/2023. (ea) (Entered: 10/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) EXHIBIT INDEX by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #10 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DHS Evidence, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice to Appear #3 Exhibit 3 - IJ Decision, September 2022, #4 Exhibit 4 - IJ Reconsideration Decision, January 9, 2023, #5 Exhibit 5 - IJ Removal Order, January 19, 2023, #6 Exhibit 6 - BIA Decision, May 24, 2023, #7 Exhibit 7 - Fourth Circuit Temporary Stay, July 18, 2023, #8 Exhibit 8 - Fourth Circuit Denial of Stay, July 28, 2023, #9 Exhibit - 9 Notification Alien Address, #10 Exhibit 10 - Petitioner Prior Habeas Petition, #11 Exhibit 11 - MJ Report Recommendation, March 28, 2023, #12 Exhibit 12 - Order Granting R&R, May 4, 2023, #13 Exhibit 13 - IJ Bond Redetermination Order with Exhibits, #14 Exhibit 14 - DHS Evidence Bond Redetermination)(Donahue, Gerard) Modified on 10/13/2023 (nr). (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Donahue, Gerard) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation to file Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Donahue, Gerard) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation to file Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donahue, Gerard) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard Thomas Donahue on behalf of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Donahue, Gerard) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for H/C Served on US Attorney - Williamsport. (ea) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the petition is DEEMED FILED. The Clerk of Court is directed to to serve the petition #1 petition for writ of habeas corpus and this Order on Respondent and the United States Attorney. (See Order for further details) Show Cause Response due by 10/10/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 9/19/2023. (ea) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketReceipt of payment from NATHANIEL MICHAEL NYAMEKYE in the amount of $5.00 for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Transaction posted on 9/15/2023. Receipt number 111101332 processed by AA. (tp) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 111101332. Petition is now deemed FILED. (ea) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (ea) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2023: #1 AO85 Notice and Consent Form) (ea). (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Nathanael Nyamekye. (ea) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nathanael Nyamekye. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Decision to Continue Detention) (ea) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less