This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2023 at 08:20:24 (UTC).

Shurden v. Boehringer Ingelheim et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2023 Shurden filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-22629

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary C Shurden

Defendants

Boehringer Ingelheim

GlaxoSmithKline

Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC

Pfizer

Sanofi

Novitium Pharma LLC

L. Perrigo Co.

Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp.

Granules USA, Inc.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC

Ajanta Pharma USA Inc.

Apotex Corporation

Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.

Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Sandoz, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.

Ranbaxy Inc.

Strides Pharma, Inc.

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason W. Earley

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

04/20/2023

Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gary C Shurden. Apotex Corporation waiver sent on 4/7/2023, response/answer due 6/6/2023. (Earley, Jason) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketCivil Case Terminated. Case is stayed and closed per Pretrial Order #80 in 20-MD-2924-RLR. (nwn) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

Docket(#2) MDL 2924 Judge Assignment with Tag-Along Case Receipt from the Southern District of Florida. Judge Robin L. Rosenberg assigned FLSD Case Number 3:23-cv-22629. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-MD-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified. (nwn) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16505245, filed by Gary C Shurden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Earley, Jason) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less