This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2023 at 09:51:01 (UTC).

Strander v. USAA Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/29/2023 Strander filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against USAA Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lance M Africk and Karen Wells Roby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-05685

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lance M Africk

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Devin Strander

Defendants

Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

USAA Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Leo J Palazzo

Davin Savoy

Jason J. Markey

Mario A. Arteaga

Defendant Attorneys

Sara Lynn Braslow

H. Minor Pipes, III

Stephen L. Miles

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2023 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (blg) (Entered: 10/26/2023)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #4 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company.(Braslow, Sara) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

#6

(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Braslow, Sara) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

#5

(#5) Notice of Compliance by Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Braslow, Sara) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

4 #7

Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties

4 #6

Exhibit E - LDOI - Garrison

4 #5

Exhibit D - Email Demand

4 #4

Exhibit C - 2023-02-23 Demand

4 #3

Exhibit B - Dec Page

4 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Record

4 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th JDC, Parish of Jefferson, case number 842972 (Fee previously paid) filed by Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Dec Page, #4 Exhibit C - 2023-02-23 Demand, #5 Exhibit D - Email Demand, #6 Exhibit E - LDOI - Garrison, #7 Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties)Attorney Sara Lynn Braslow added to party Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Braslow, Sara) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/3/2023) (ko). (Entered: 09/29/2023)

#3

(#3) **FILED IN ERROR--SEE REC. Doc. 6** Statement of Corporate Disclosure by USAA Insurance Agency, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for USAA Insurance Agency, Inc. (Braslow, Sara) Modified on 10/3/2023 (ko). (Entered: 09/29/2023)

#2

(#2) **FILED IN ERROR--SEE REC. Doc. 5** Notice of Compliance by USAA Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Braslow, Sara) Modified on 10/3/2023 (ko). (Entered: 09/29/2023)

1 #3

Notice to Adverse Party

1 #2

Exhibit A-E

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2023 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (blg) (Entered: 10/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ANSWER to #4 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company.(Braslow, Sara) (Entered: 10/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Notice of Removal: Filing attorney did not properly format PDF of Civil Cover Sheet. When the document was opened, the PDF was able to be edited. When using a form, print the document to PDF format prior to uploading. Clerk took corrective action by replacing image with one that cannot be edited. (ko) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

Docket(#7) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mb) (Entered: 10/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Braslow, Sara) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Notice of Compliance by Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Braslow, Sara) (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th JDC, Parish of Jefferson, case number 842972 (Fee previously paid) filed by Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Dec Page, #4 Exhibit C - 2023-02-23 Demand, #5 Exhibit D - Email Demand, #6 Exhibit E - LDOI - Garrison, #7 Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties)Attorney Sara Lynn Braslow added to party Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Braslow, Sara) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/3/2023) (ko). (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) **FILED IN ERROR--SEE REC. Doc. 6** Statement of Corporate Disclosure by USAA Insurance Agency, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for USAA Insurance Agency, Inc. (Braslow, Sara) Modified on 10/3/2023 (ko). (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) **FILED IN ERROR--SEE REC. Doc. 5** Notice of Compliance by USAA Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Braslow, Sara) Modified on 10/3/2023 (ko). (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) **FILED IN ERROR--SEE REC. DOC. 4** NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th JDC, Parish of Jefferson, case number 842972 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10187053) filed by USAA Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-E, #3 Notice to Adverse Party)Attorney Sara Lynn Braslow added to party USAA Insurance Agency, Inc.(pty:dft).(Braslow, Sara) Modified on 10/3/2023 (ko). (Entered: 09/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less