This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2023 at 07:47:26 (UTC).

Bell v. Employment Connection

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 Bell filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Employment Connection. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00267

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cherry Yolanda Bell

Defendant

Employment Connection

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Steven H. Schwartz

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Employment Connections, Jury Demand, filed by Cherry Yolanda Bell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter)(JWD) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #3

EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Cherry Yolanda Bell. (JWD) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Cherry Yolanda Bell. (JWD) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Counsel (ECF No. #3 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendant Employment Connection via its registered agent, Sal Martinez, at 2838 Market Street, St. Louis, Missouri, 63103. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 3/6/23. (KJS) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to defendant Employment Connection. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (KJS) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#7

(#7) CJRA ORDER (GJL) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from MagistrateJudge Stephen R. Welby to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. (Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings) (KJS) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Steven H. Schwartz for Defendant Employment Connection. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Employment Connection. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

 

Docket Entries

04/14/2023

DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Fri Apr 14 15:23:38 CDT 2023 (Petri, Alexis) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Employment Connection. (Schwartz, Steven) filed by Employment Connection ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Employment Connection answer due 5/8/2023. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 04/14/2023. (ANP) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Employment Connection. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Steven H. Schwartz for Defendant Employment Connection. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Cherry Yolanda Bell. Employment Connection served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (NEP) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 7. Tue Mar 21 09:37:06 CDT 2023 (Shirley, Kelley) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) CJRA ORDER (GJL) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from MagistrateJudge Stephen R. Welby to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. (Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings) (KJS) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to defendant Employment Connection. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (KJS) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023

DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Mon Mar 6 13:23:19 CST 2023 (Shirley, Kelley) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Counsel (ECF No. #3 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendant Employment Connection via its registered agent, Sal Martinez, at 2838 Market Street, St. Louis, Missouri, 63103. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 3/6/23. (KJS) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023

Docket(#4) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023

Docket***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Mar 2 16:01:16 CST 2023 (admin,) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023

Docket***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023

DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Welby. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Cherry Yolanda Bell. (JWD) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Cherry Yolanda Bell. (JWD) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Employment Connections, Jury Demand, filed by Cherry Yolanda Bell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter)(JWD) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less