This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/24/2023 at 07:48:28 (UTC).

Rywelski v. Biden et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 Rywelski filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Biden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan E Huntsman and Claire V Eagan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00217

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan E Huntsman

Presiding Judge

Claire V Eagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Marion Rywelski

Defendants

Joseph R Biden, Jr

U.S. Department of Justice

Merrick Garland

Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms & Explosives

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Joseph Marion Rywelski (blc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#2

(#2) FILING FEES Paid in Full (blc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (lmt, Dpty Clk) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/26/2023 to add notation) (lmt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joseph Marion Rywelski (mlb, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: U.S. Department of Justice (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Joseph Marion Rywelski (dla, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Joseph R Biden, Jr (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Joseph Marion Rywelski (dla, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms & Explosives (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Joseph Marion Rywelski (dla, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Merrick Garland (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Joseph Marion Rywelski (dla, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

#10

(#10) OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan -Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. # 1) is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment of dismissal is entered herewith. (Re: #1 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

#11

(#11) JUDGMENT by Judge Claire V Eagan (JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL), dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) (Re: #10 Opinion and Order,,, ) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #11 ) (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JUDGMENT by Judge Claire V Eagan (JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL), dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) (Re: #10 Opinion and Order,,, ) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan -Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. # 1) is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment of dismissal is entered herewith. (Re: #1 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 07/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Merrick Garland (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Joseph Marion Rywelski (dla, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms & Explosives (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Joseph Marion Rywelski (dla, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Joseph R Biden, Jr (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Joseph Marion Rywelski (dla, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: U.S. Department of Justice (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Joseph Marion Rywelski (dla, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joseph Marion Rywelski (mlb, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Joseph Marion Rywelski to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (lmt, Dpty Clk) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/26/2023 to add notation) (lmt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING FEES Paid in Full (blc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Joseph Marion Rywelski (blc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less