This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/02/2023 at 07:56:05 (UTC).

Brown v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2023 Brown filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Peter B. Silvain, Jr and Walter H. Rice. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peter B. Silvain, Jr

Presiding Judge

Walter H. Rice

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tracey Brown

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

M.D. Joel T Metze

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Louis Carl Schneider

Defendant Attorneys

Brenda A Sweet

Shannon Kemp Bockelman

Meredith C. Turner-Woolley

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Stay by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

11 #2

Exhibit 1-Sattelmyer v. Covidien LLC

11 #1

Memorandum in Support

#11

(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-Sattelmyer v. Covidien LLC) (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Shannon Kemp Bockelman substituting for Robert Mitchell as to Defendant Joel T Metze. (Bockelman, Shannon) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION (Joint) for Extension of Time for Defendants to Move or Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

#8

(#8) (COPY of) Amended Answer of Defendant, Joel T. Metze, M.D. to #6 Plaintiff's Complaint; Jury Demand Endorsed Hereon filed by Joel T Metze. Originally filed on March 21, 2023, in the Montgomery County Common Pleas Court under Case No. 2023cv1040. (bjr) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#7

(#7) (COPY of) Answer of Defendant, Joel T. Metze, M.D., to #6 Plaintiff's Complaint; Jury Demand Endorsed Hereon filed by Joel T Metze M.D. Originally filed on March 21, 2023, in the Montgomery County Common Pleas Court under Case No. 2023 CV 01040. (bjr) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

6 #1

Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT AS TO DEFENDANTS JOEL T METZE, M.D.

#6

(#6) (COPY of) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Tracey Brown. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Merit by Himanshu Aggarwal, M.D. as to Defendants, Joel T. Metze M.D.) Original filed on February 28, 2023, in the Montgomery County Common Pleas Court under Case No. 2023 CV 01040. (bjr) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas M. Rose recused. Case reassigned to Judge Walter H. Rice for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 4/4/23. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re #1 Notice of Removal, of Amended Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Sever Plaintiff's Medical Malpractice Claim Against Joel T. Metze, M.D. by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support) (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

1 #4

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B-Montgomery County Pleadings

1 #1

Exhibit A-Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County, Ohio Common Pleas, case number 2023-CV-01040 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9350071), filed by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Montgomery County Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Stay by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-Sattelmyer v. Covidien LLC) (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Shannon Kemp Bockelman substituting for Robert Mitchell as to Defendant Joel T Metze. (Bockelman, Shannon) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Defendants, Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, Answer(s) due 4/14/2023. (bjr) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION (Joint) for Extension of Time for Defendants to Move or Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) (COPY of) Amended Answer of Defendant, Joel T. Metze, M.D. to #6 Plaintiff's Complaint; Jury Demand Endorsed Hereon filed by Joel T Metze. Originally filed on March 21, 2023, in the Montgomery County Common Pleas Court under Case No. 2023cv1040. (bjr) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (COPY of) Answer of Defendant, Joel T. Metze, M.D., to #6 Plaintiff's Complaint; Jury Demand Endorsed Hereon filed by Joel T Metze M.D. Originally filed on March 21, 2023, in the Montgomery County Common Pleas Court under Case No. 2023 CV 01040. (bjr) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) (COPY of) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Tracey Brown. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Merit by Himanshu Aggarwal, M.D. as to Defendants, Joel T. Metze M.D.) Original filed on February 28, 2023, in the Montgomery County Common Pleas Court under Case No. 2023 CV 01040. (bjr) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas M. Rose recused. Case reassigned to Judge Walter H. Rice for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 4/4/23. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re #1 Notice of Removal, of Amended Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Sever Plaintiff's Medical Malpractice Claim Against Joel T. Metze, M.D. by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support) (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County, Ohio Common Pleas, case number 2023-CV-01040 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9350071), filed by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Montgomery County Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Sweet, Brenda) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less