This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2023 at 07:39:07 (UTC).

TOBIAS v. NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2023 TOBIAS filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Boasberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01267

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Boasberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIMMY TOBIAS

Defendants

NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Topic

Defendant Attorney

Stephanie R. Johnson

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10047104) filed by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit 1-4

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

#6

(#6) Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' #6 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by August 31, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/23/2023. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/22/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by June 22, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/8/2023. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (zljn) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10047104) filed by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less