This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/12/2023 at 07:44:15 (UTC).

COOK et al v. U.S. XPRESS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2023 COOK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against U S XPRESS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Rukhsanah L. Singh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-03228

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Rukhsanah L. Singh

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARK A. COOK

DENISE G COOK

Defendants

U.S. XPRESS, INC.

JOHN DOES 1-3

JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM E MANDRY

Defendant Attorneys

JEFFREY A. SEGAL

MARIA MARGARET ROSSI

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. XPRESS, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey- Warren County, case number 168-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14385343), filed by U.S. XPRESS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Index A-B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

1 #1

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Index A-B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. XPRESS, INC.. (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

#3

(#3) Clerk's Letter: Attorney Chad R. Williams is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to 91 South Main Street, Phillipsburg, New Jersey, 08865 (jdg) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2023 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh in person at the Clarkson S. Fisher Building & U.S Courthouse, 402 East State Street, Trenton, NJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 6/13/2023. (kht) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. XPRESS, INC..(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 06/19/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM E MANDRY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MANDRY, WILLIAM) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

#7

(#7) Joint Discovery Plan by U.S. XPRESS, INC..(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

#8

(#8) Letter from Jeffrey A. Segal re #4 Order,, Set Hearings,, Set/Clear Flags,. (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by MARIA MARGARET ROSSI on behalf of U.S. XPRESS, INC. (ROSSI, MARIA) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

#10

(#10) CONSENT ORDER granting request for 7/25/2023 Scheduling Conference to be held via Zoom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 7/19/2023. (mlh) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

#11

(#11) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/16/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties must be with leave of Court and filed by no later than 8/18/2023. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 4/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/3/2023. (jal, ) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/16/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties must be with leave of Court and filed by no later than 8/18/2023. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 4/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/3/2023. (jal, ) (Entered: 08/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

DocketText Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Initial Pretrial Conference via zoom held on 7/25/2023. (mm) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) CONSENT ORDER granting request for 7/25/2023 Scheduling Conference to be held via Zoom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 7/19/2023. (mlh) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by MARIA MARGARET ROSSI on behalf of U.S. XPRESS, INC. (ROSSI, MARIA) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Letter from Jeffrey A. Segal re #4 Order,, Set Hearings,, Set/Clear Flags,. (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Joint Discovery Plan by U.S. XPRESS, INC..(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 07/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM E MANDRY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MANDRY, WILLIAM) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. XPRESS, INC..(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 06/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2023 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh in person at the Clarkson S. Fisher Building & U.S Courthouse, 402 East State Street, Trenton, NJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 6/13/2023. (kht) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Clerk's Letter: Attorney Chad R. Williams is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to 91 South Main Street, Phillipsburg, New Jersey, 08865 (jdg) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by parties and intervenors in diversity actions to identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Such disclosure statements must be filed with the parties, intervenors or proposed intervenors first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response or other request addressed to the Court. (jdg, ) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (jdg) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. XPRESS, INC.. (SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. XPRESS, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey- Warren County, case number 168-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14385343), filed by U.S. XPRESS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Index A-B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less