This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2023 at 10:04:20 (UTC).

Zorro Productions, Inc. v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 09/11/2023 Zorro Productions, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Gettleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-08794

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zorro Productions, Inc.

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A Hereto

7295857

8909976

aida.star.shop

artlux_shop

best store online

caesarin

cheertoys

menstoy

pollaw_1

caizhiquan

cehnxuanhuaksdk

Changsha Li Xianru Trading Co., Ltd.

chenjiadeuxjsn

chenliangjinsdtg

chenlihuit

chenlironghjhj

chenyaoyonge

183 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Payton Mcmurray

William Benjamin Kalbac

Michael A. Hierl

 

Court Documents

#53

(#53) ANSWER to Complaint by Defendant No. 170 shirtfactoryuk. (Exhibits). (jn, ) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

#52

(#52) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Zorro Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 164 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2023)

#51

(#51) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (rc, ) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

#50

(#50) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (rc, ) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

#49

(#49) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Zorro Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 52, 163 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

#48

(#48) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Zorro Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

#47

(#47) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Zorro Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

#46

No Description Available

#45

No Description Available

#44

No Description Available

#43

No Description Available

#42

No Description Available

#41

No Description Available

#40

No Description Available

#39

No Description Available

#38

No Description Available

#37

No Description Available

#36

No Description Available

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#53) ANSWER to Complaint by Defendant No. 170 shirtfactoryuk. (Exhibits). (jn, ) (Entered: 11/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#52) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Zorro Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant No. 164 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#51) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (rc, ) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#50) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (rc, ) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#49) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Zorro Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants No. 52, 163 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#48) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Zorro Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#47) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Zorro Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Certain Defendants (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketNEW PARTIES: wengfeilong, wenzhoulianwumaoyigongsi9, WHHHJi, WXY Art Shop, XIAOYIHUA, xishanquhaoshufuzhuangdian, xushaoyang, yanbingsangjshych, yangchengzhu, yangdajhxtsl, yangminglikk, yangrongqiangk, YANGXIN Art, yangyuzhenyishu, yangzhixinhaibao, yiboskdkd, YSDBJ, Zhang Hongze, zhangqingjieutu, zhangshaolingkn, ZHENGFANFAN, zhenghuihuangksdk, zhengqunshuangkkskdh, ZHOU PENG, ZLEEZ, zongbo, ZZdkai, Fuyang Huce Trading Co., Ltd. and Fuyang Qiyuke E-Commerce Co., Ltd. added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketNEW PARTIES: Gabcus, ganglijuan, GIAPHUSTROE, gongguipingijyu, Haikoushiyiweilaishangmaoyouxiangongsi, hefeishijiaoyongdianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, hejingpqiepd, huangdongyan, huangliuxiangksjdks, huangqingjhtf, huangyuyting, jinxinpopzx, jinyuhengjshdj, KARAGUZEL STORE, kunmingshipanlongquyuxinjiankangxinxizixunbu, LHqiang, LI XUEJING, lian poster, liaoguifengxkhdkhgfsg, lifengbi, lijianpingksjdks, lishanshanliepqo, liuminzhi, liuzhikunsggegsff, lixiandongalochwb, LWWZzzz, LZQQQQQQ, panhaipingjsdj, Putian Chengxiang District Wenxilai Garment Trade, putianshifanzaimaoyiyouxiangongsi, rongxunyytt, ShenWeidemaozhuadian, SHxin, simaoqujiangenanmodian, songliudingsdisyd, SSHh, STAM2000, SusanArt, TaiYuanJiaQingDianZiShangWuYouXianGongSi, TaiYuanYanLeiMaoYiYouXianGongSi, tangyanhbgf, TangYinXianSuiChengBiShangMaoYouXianGongSi, Tjingjing, wanghaoyuduys, wangshashakker, wangxingo, wangyuanlkjsduie and wenchanggeyushangmaoyouxiangongsi566 added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketNEW PARTIES: fightingqueentoy, gendryer, jasminstoree, magicmusicmadness, maiduo, martecshop, martyma-paracojh, masstore_8, maul_31, mohaat-6705, mr.brian2009, nygu70, posteroll, shirtfactoryuk, shopsupra, southein, thepartyshop147, tidingsellertoys, toystory98, tweet.deals, violang, vipimages, wiregrassseller, BAHAR CUKURKOL, Bodacon, chenfeisydon, chenmeifangyer, chenxiaoweiksjdksjd, CHENYICAHNG, chenyichong, chenzhenjier, cuikunmingksjd, CXQMY, D39, Decleezw, dongfangmaohuashangmaoyouxiangongsi, DongWanShiZhangAnPinQiangHuiBaiHuoDian, foshanshinanhaiquhandiegangshangmaoyouxiangongsi and FuYangShiShiKeDianZiShangWuYouXianGongSi added to case caption. (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 10/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
09/11/2023

DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (axk, ) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axk, ) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Zorro Productions, Inc. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Zorro Productions, Inc. Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Zorro Productions, Inc. to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zorro Productions, Inc. by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zorro Productions, Inc. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zorro Productions, Inc. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Zorro Productions, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21037429. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less