This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/12/2023 at 08:08:27 (UTC).

Scullian et al v. Evanston Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/13/2023 Scullian filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Evanston Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel C. Irick and Wendy W. Berger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-00670

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

Presiding Judge

Wendy W. Berger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen Scullian

Defendant

Evanston Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roger A. Hatfield

Defendant Attorneys

Justine D. Roof

Michael J. Rivero

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

1 #2

Exhibit Notice of Service of Process

1 #3

Exhibit State Court Amended Complaint

1 #4

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit Property Appraiser Report

1 #6

Exhibit Notice of Intent to Litigate and State Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (ECJ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael J. Rivero on behalf of Evanston Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Michael J. Rivero. (Rivero, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#6

(#6) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Evanston Insurance Company.(Rivero, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by Stephen Scullian(as POA for Raymond Scullian), Stephen Scullian. Related Cases: No. (Hatfield, Roger) Modified on 4/28/2023 to edit the docket text (RPB). (Entered: 04/28/2023)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Stephen Scullian(as POA for Raymond Scullian), Stephen Scullian. (Hatfield, Roger) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Evanston Insurance Company. (Rivero, Michael) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

#12

(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Rivero, Michael) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2023 Joinder of Parties due by 6/12/2023 Discovery due by 9/30/2024 Dispositive motions due by 10/30/2024 Pretrial statement due by 3/4/2025 All other motions due by 2/3/2025 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 7/31/2024 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 8/30/2024 Trial Status Conference set for 3/11/2025 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger Jury Trial set for the April 2025 trial term commencing on 4/1/2025 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 10/15/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/23/2023. (RMF) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • Docket(#14) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Mediator: TBD (KNC) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2023 Joinder of Parties due by 6/12/2023 Discovery due by 9/30/2024 Dispositive motions due by 10/30/2024 Pretrial statement due by 3/4/2025 All other motions due by 2/3/2025 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 7/31/2024 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 8/30/2024 Trial Status Conference set for 3/11/2025 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger Jury Trial set for the April 2025 trial term commencing on 4/1/2025 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 10/15/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/23/2023. (RMF) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Rivero, Michael) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Evanston Insurance Company. (Rivero, Michael) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Stephen Scullian(as POA for Raymond Scullian), Stephen Scullian. (Hatfield, Roger) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by Stephen Scullian(as POA for Raymond Scullian), Stephen Scullian. Related Cases: No. (Hatfield, Roger) Modified on 4/28/2023 to edit the docket text (RPB). (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/25/2023. (RMF) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Evanston Insurance Company.(Rivero, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael J. Rivero on behalf of Evanston Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Michael J. Rivero. (Rivero, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL - of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KNC) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (ECJ) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:23-cv-00670-WWB-DCI. (BCB) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court in and for Volusia County, case number 2023-30277-CICI filed in State Court on March 6, 2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-20720808 filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process, #3 Exhibit State Court Amended Complaint, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit Property Appraiser Report, #6 Exhibit Notice of Intent to Litigate and State Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rivero, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less