This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/18/2023 at 13:41:31 (UTC).

Barra v. McDonald et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2023 Barra filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against McDonald. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Barry W Ashe and Karen Wells Roby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-05373

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barry W Ashe

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keianna Barra

Defendants

Jeffery Wade McDonald

Continental Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John D. Sileo

Casey William Moll

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10159522) filed by Keianna Barra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney John D. Sileo added to party Keianna Barra(pty:pla).(Sileo, John) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Continental Casualty Company, Jeffery Wade McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

3 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Continental Casualty Company on 10/16/2023, answer due 12/15/2023. (Sileo, John) (Entered: 10/16/2023)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Jeffery Wade McDonald on 10/16/2023, answer due 12/15/2023. (Sileo, John) (Entered: 10/16/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Jeffery Wade McDonald on 10/16/2023, answer due 12/15/2023. (Sileo, John) (Entered: 10/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Continental Casualty Company on 10/16/2023, answer due 12/15/2023. (Sileo, John) (Entered: 10/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Continental Casualty Company, Jeffery Wade McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am) (Entered: 09/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (kls) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10159522) filed by Keianna Barra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney John D. Sileo added to party Keianna Barra(pty:pla).(Sileo, John) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less