This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 10:29:30 (UTC).

CETINER ARIGUN v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 CETINER ARIGUN filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-13754

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEVDA CETINER ARIGUN

Defendants

UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

DIRECTOR OF USCIS UR M JADDOU

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mustafa Cetin

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua Samuel Press

Craig Arthur Oswald

AUSA - Chicago

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

10/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) DESIGNATION of Joshua Samuel Press as U.S. Attorney for Defendants UR M JADDOU, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Press, Joshua) (Entered: 10/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 1/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Outline for the Initial Joint Status Report) (rao, ) (Entered: 10/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants UR M JADDOU, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 10/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SEVDA CETINER ARIGUN as to All Defendants (Cetin, Mustafa) (Entered: 10/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketSUMMONS Issued as to UR M JADDOU, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, and U.S. Attorney General (axa, ) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (nsf, ) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (nsf, ) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by SEVDA CETINER ARIGUN; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21081346. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cetin, Mustafa) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less