This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/30/2023 at 07:53:08 (UTC).

Thomas Gayron v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2023 Thomas Gayron filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01829

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Gayron

Defendants

3M Company

AGC Chemicals Americas Inc

Amerex Corporation

Archroma US Inc

Arkema Inc

Buckeye Fire Equipment

Carrier Global Corporation

Chemguard Inc

Fire Service Plus Inc

E I Du Pont De Nemours & Co

Globe Manufacturing Company LLC

Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc

Johnson Controls Inc

Lion Group Inc

MSA Safety Inc

National Foam Inc

PBI Performance Products Inc

Perimeter Solutions LP

Southern Mills Inc doing business as Ten Cate Protective Fabrics USA

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bethany Caracuzzo

Caroline Camille Corbitt

Jonathan Krasne Levine

Richard Robert Seal

Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker

Heather Page Haggarty

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11077596.), filed by Thomas Gayron. Service due by 7/31/2023(sshe, ) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • Docket(#3) MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 5/1/2023), Thomas Gayron v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-01829-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Southern New York (sshe, ) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11077596.), filed by Thomas Gayron. Service due by 7/31/2023(sshe, ) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less