This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2023 at 08:11:54 (UTC).

Johnson-Shorter v. Smith Transport, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 Johnson-Shorter filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Smith Transport, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Geraghty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02305

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Geraghty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rolanda Johnson-Shorter

Defendants

Smith Transport, Inc.

Gerald Tickle

Arch Insurance Company

ABC Entity

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shawn T. Richardson

N. John Bey

Defendant Attorneys

Donavan Eason

Blair Joseph Cash

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting attorney Blair J. Cash's #9 Petition for Leave of Absence. See order for more details. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 7/14/2023. (sap) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Petition for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/17/2023-7/24/2023, 9/25/2023-9/29/2023, 10/10/20203-10/13/2023, 12/20/2023-1/3/2024, by Blair Joseph Cash. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cash, Blair) Modified on 7/6/2023 (sap). (Entered: 07/05/2023)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case shall proceed on a 6-month discovery track. Daubert motions with regard to expert testimony shall be filed no later than 30 days after the close of discovery. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 6/13/2023. (ane) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

#7

(#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Arch Insurance Company. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 6/2/2023. (sap) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arch Insurance Company, Smith Transport, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Heartland Express Inc. for Smith Transport, Inc.; Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group (U.S.) Inc. for Arch Insurance Company. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Arch Insurance Company. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Arch Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 10/23/2023.(Cash, Blair) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/26/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal by Arch Insurance Company (Cash, Blair) Modified on 5/24/2023 (ane). (Entered: 05/23/2023)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit E to Brief - Secretary of State Registration of Arch Insurance C

1 #5

Exhibit D to Brief - Secretary of State Registration of SmithTransport

1 #4

Exhibit C to Brief - Affidavit of Service on Arch Insurance Company

1 #3

Exhibit B to Brief - Docket Report

1 #2

Exhibit A to Brief - State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Brief in Support of Notice of Removal

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER granting attorney Blair J. Cash's #9 Petition for Leave of Absence. See order for more details. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 7/14/2023. (sap) (Entered: 07/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Petition for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 7/17/2023-7/24/2023, 9/25/2023-9/29/2023, 10/10/20203-10/13/2023, 12/20/2023-1/3/2024, by Blair Joseph Cash. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cash, Blair) Modified on 7/6/2023 (sap). (Entered: 07/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case shall proceed on a 6-month discovery track. Daubert motions with regard to expert testimony shall be filed no later than 30 days after the close of discovery. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 6/13/2023. (ane) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Arch Insurance Company. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 6/2/2023. (sap) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arch Insurance Company, Smith Transport, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Heartland Express Inc. for Smith Transport, Inc.; Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group (U.S.) Inc. for Arch Insurance Company. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Arch Insurance Company. (Cash, Blair) (Entered: 05/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Arch Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 10/23/2023.(Cash, Blair) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal by Arch Insurance Company (Cash, Blair) Modified on 5/24/2023 (ane). (Entered: 05/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Arch Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12614018) (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Brief - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B to Brief - Docket Report, #4 Exhibit C to Brief - Affidavit of Service on Arch Insurance Company, #5 Exhibit D to Brief - Secretary of State Registration of SmithTransport, #6 Exhibit E to Brief - Secretary of State Registration of Arch Insurance C, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(dnb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less