This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/27/2023 at 06:49:01 (UTC).

Teets v. Medtronic, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2023 Teets filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jose E. Martinez and Jacqueline Becerra. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-21549

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jose E. Martinez

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Becerra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Margaret Teets

Defendants

Medtronic, Inc

Heartware, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D. Todd Mathews

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel I.A. Smulian

Alexandra Bach Lagos

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

State Court Complaint & Other Documents

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #7

Exhibit F

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement Rule 7.1 by Heartware, Inc., Medtronic, Inc (Lagos, Alexandra) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

#4

(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Daniel I.A. Smulian, mailing date April 25, 2023, (pt) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

#5

(#5) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 5/6/2024 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 5/2/2024 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 3/7/2024.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#6

(#6) Notice of Court Practice In Removal Cases, (Removal Status Report due by 5/10/2023.) Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Heartware, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lagos, Alexandra) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#9

(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Medtronic, Inc (Lagos, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

#10

(#10) FINAL ORDER of Dismissal re #9 Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal; Dismissing this Action (Without Prejudice) ; Case is Closed. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/11/2023. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FINAL ORDER of Dismissal re #9 Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal; Dismissing this Action (Without Prejudice) ; Case is Closed. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/11/2023. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Medtronic, Inc (Lagos, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketSet/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Heartware, Inc. response/answer due 5/30/2023; Medtronic, Inc response/answer due 5/30/2023. Per DE 8 Order. (ebz) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before May 30, 2023. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/2/2023. (kin) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Heartware, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lagos, Alexandra) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Court Practice In Removal Cases, (Removal Status Report due by 5/10/2023.) Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 5/6/2024 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 5/2/2024 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 3/7/2024.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (cqs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 04/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Daniel I.A. Smulian, mailing date April 25, 2023, (pt) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement Rule 7.1 by Heartware, Inc., Medtronic, Inc (Lagos, Alexandra) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16567073, filed by Heartware,Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint & Other Documents, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Lagos, Alexandra) No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed. Modified Text/Attachment Description on 4/25/2023 (nwn). (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less