This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/21/2023 at 08:37:22 (UTC).

Alsaedi et al v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2023 Alsaedi filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jennifer L. Rochon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-05314

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer L. Rochon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rashad Alsaedi

Red Apple Deli Corp.

Defendants

United States of America

United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jess Martin Berkowitz

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27908073)Document filed by Rashad Alsaedi, Red Apple Deli Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit FNS letter 9/10/2020, #3 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #4 Exhibit FNS letter 7/11/2022, #5 Exhibit Final Agency Decision).(Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

1 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff

1 #2

Exhibit FNS letter 9/10/2020

1 #3

Exhibit Transaction Reports

1 #4

Exhibit FNS letter 7/11/2022

1 #5

Exhibit Final Agency Decision

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rashad Alsaedi, Red Apple Deli Corp...(Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed.(Berkowitz, Jess) Modified on 6/23/2023 (sj). (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America. (sj) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 6/26/2023) (jca) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, served. United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service served on 7/18/2023, answer due 9/18/2023; United States of America served on 7/18/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Rashad Alsaedi; Red Apple Deli Corp...(Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

 

Docket Entries

07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, served. United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service served on 7/18/2023, answer due 9/18/2023; United States of America served on 7/18/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Rashad Alsaedi; Red Apple Deli Corp...(Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 6/26/2023) (jca) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America. (sj) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jess Martin Berkowitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code (none). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 07:2023. (sj) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jess Martin Berkowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; Civil Cover Sheet consists of 2 pages, only one page attached. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jess Martin Berkowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States Department of Agriculture. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed.(Berkowitz, Jess) Modified on 6/23/2023 (sj). (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Rashad Alsaedi, Red Apple Deli Corp...(Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27908073)Document filed by Rashad Alsaedi, Red Apple Deli Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit FNS letter 9/10/2020, #3 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #4 Exhibit FNS letter 7/11/2022, #5 Exhibit Final Agency Decision).(Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less