This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2023 at 08:16:28 (UTC).

Truist Bank v. Fusion Technology, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 Truist Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Fusion Technology, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S Kleeh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00047

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S Kleeh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Truist Bank

Defendants

Fusion Technology, LLC

John Bott

Sharon R. Pitsenbarger

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordan Sengewalt

Michael S. Garrison

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truist Bank identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Truist Bank, formerly Branch Banking and Trust Company, a North Carolina banking corporation for Truist Bank.. (Sengewalt, Jordan) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sharon R. Pitsenbarger served on 6/12/2023. (Garrison, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to John Bott served on 6/12/2023. (Garrison, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Fusion Technology, LLC served on 6/15/2023. (Garrison, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Fusion Technology, LLC served accepted by SOS on 6/12/2023. (snc) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Fusion Technology, LLC served accepted by SOS on 6/12/2023. (snc) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Fusion Technology, LLC served on 6/15/2023. (Garrison, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to John Bott served on 6/12/2023. (Garrison, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sharon R. Pitsenbarger served on 6/12/2023. (Garrison, Michael) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truist Bank identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Truist Bank, formerly Branch Banking and Trust Company, a North Carolina banking corporation for Truist Bank.. (Sengewalt, Jordan) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against John Bott, Fusion Technology, LLC, Sharon R. Pitsenbarger, filed by Truist Bank. Filing Fee $402. Receipt # AWVNDC-3719235 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Business Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Commercial Security Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - iLien Cover Page, #5 Exhibit E - Commercial Guaranty, #6 Exhibit F - Commercial Guaranty, #7 Exhibit G - Change in Terms Agreement, #8 Exhibit H - Change in Terms Agreement, #9 Exhibit I - Letter, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (snc) Modified on 5/24/2023 to name exhibits (snc). (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less