This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/26/2023 at 07:48:53 (UTC).

Turem v. U.S. Social Security Administration et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2023 Turem filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia Morales Howard and Joel B. Toomey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00349

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia Morales Howard

Referral Judge

Joel B. Toomey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason C. Turem

Defendants

U.S. Social Security Administration

U.S. Department of Housing & Urban Development

U.S. Department of Education

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Mailing Envelope

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

IFP Short Form

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit A - Inmate Account Statement

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #3

Exhibit C

3 #4

Exhibit D

3 #5

Mailing Envelope

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jason C. Turem. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Inmate Account Statement, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Mailing Envelope)(BD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay filing fee or complete and file Affidavit of Indigency on or before April 24, 2023. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Short Form)(KMD) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Education, U.S. Department of Housing & Urban Development, U.S. Social Security Administration filed by Jason C. Turem. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Mailing Envelope) (Fees not paid, No IFP, No service copies)(JDR) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less