This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2023 at 08:51:24 (UTC).

Ahmed et al v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2023 Ahmed filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are LaShann DeArcy Hall and Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-05507

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LaShann DeArcy Hall

Referral Judge

Ramon E. Reyes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Naser Ahmed

Brookdale Deli And Grill Inc.

Defendants

United States of America

United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jess Martin Berkowitz

Defendant Attorney

Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

9 #1

*Restricted*

#9

(#9) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-04694. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/20/2023)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the defendant and the plaintiff, that the above-captioned action be, and hereby is, transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1406(a). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/19/2023) (tg) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 07/19/2023)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America..(Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher on behalf of United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America..(Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 07/18/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on September 27, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Courts Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov /hon-jesse-m-furman. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 9/27/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/5/2023) (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 06/06/2023)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 06/05/2023)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berkowitz, Jess) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 06/04/2023)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by NASER AHMED, BROOKDALE DELI AND GRILL INC...(Berkowitz, Jess) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 06/04/2023)

1 #7

Exhibit Final Agency Decision

1 #6

Exhibit Attorney letter 7/9/2022

1 #5

Exhibit FNS letter 6/28/2022

1 #4

Exhibit Attorney letter 5/5/2022

1 #3

Exhibit Transaction Reports

1 #2

Exhibit FNS letter 5/2/2022

1 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/20/2023

DocketThe case of Ahmed et al v. United States of America, has been transferred from Southern District of New York to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 23-cv-5507. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (KD) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) (Entered: 07/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-04694. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketCASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York.(tg) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 07/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the defendant and the plaintiff, that the above-captioned action be, and hereby is, transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1406(a). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/19/2023) (tg) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 07/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America..(Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher on behalf of United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America..(Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on September 27, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone in accordance with Paragraph 3.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. The parties should join the conference by calling the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749 and using access code 542-1540, followed by the pound (#) key. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Courts Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov /hon-jesse-m-furman. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 9/27/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/5/2023) (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 06/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jess Martin Berkowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NASER AHMED; BROOKDALE DELI AND GRILL INC.; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berkowitz, Jess) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 06/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by NASER AHMED, BROOKDALE DELI AND GRILL INC...(Berkowitz, Jess) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 06/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27826595)Document filed by NASER AHMED, BROOKDALE DELI AND GRILL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit FNS letter 5/2/2022, #3 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #4 Exhibit Attorney letter 5/5/2022, #5 Exhibit FNS letter 6/28/2022, #6 Exhibit Attorney letter 7/9/2022, #7 Exhibit Final Agency Decision).(Berkowitz, Jess) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/20/2023.] (Entered: 06/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less