This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2023 at 08:38:19 (UTC).

Alvarez Rodriguez et al v. XTRA LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 Alvarez Rodriguez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against XTRA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-04246

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carina Maria Alvarez Rodriguez

Ana Peguero De Noboa

Defendants

XTRA LLC

Edwin Monegro Ortiz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michelle Jean-Jacques

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Adam Segal

Ian Kingsley

James Anthony Wescoe

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit plaintiffsComplaint, along with all other process, pleadings, and orders

1 #2

Exhibit Affidavits of Service

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wescoe, James) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by XTRA LLC..(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Jean-Jacques on behalf of Carina Maria Alvarez Rodriguez, Ana Peguero De Noboa..(Jean-Jacques, Michelle) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian Kingsley on behalf of XTRA LLC..(Kingsley, Ian) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#6

(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wescoe, James) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Edwin Monegro Ortiz..(Wescoe, James) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

 

Docket Entries

06/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Edwin Monegro Ortiz..(Wescoe, James) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wescoe, James) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian Kingsley on behalf of XTRA LLC..(Kingsley, Ian) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Jean-Jacques on behalf of Carina Maria Alvarez Rodriguez, Ana Peguero De Noboa..(Jean-Jacques, Michelle) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney James Anthony Wescoe. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx. (vf) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney James Anthony Wescoe to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Courthouse Assignment Section not provided; Signature Error. The Form is not Signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by XTRA LLC..(Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wescoe, James) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 805506-2023E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27771123).Document filed by Edwin Monegro Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit plaintiffsComplaint, along with all other process, pleadings, and orders served, #2 Exhibit Affidavits of Service).(Wescoe, James) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less