This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/06/2023 at 21:40:29 (UTC).

Arch Insurance Company v. Varsity Brands Holding Company Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2023 Arch Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Varsity Brands Holding Company Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas L. Parker and Charmiane G. Claxton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-02545

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Parker

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arch Insurance Company

Defendant

Varsity Brands Holding Company Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D. Craig Lamb

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Varsity Brands Holding Company Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4222514), filed by Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Certificate of Insurance-July 31, 2017, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-Certificate of Insurance-May 7, 2020, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C-Certificate of Insurance-June 14, 2018)(Lamb, D. Craig) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A-Certificate of Insurance-July 31, 2017

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B-Certificate of Insurance-May 7, 2020

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C-Certificate of Insurance-June 14, 2018

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arch Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group Ltd. for Arch Insurance Company.. (Lamb, D. Craig) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

#3

(#3) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Arch Insurance Company (Lamb, D. Craig) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

#8

(#8) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/12/2023. (Parker, Thomas) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/12/2023. (Parker, Thomas) (Entered: 10/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Arch Insurance Company (Lamb, D. Craig) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arch Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group Ltd. for Arch Insurance Company.. (Lamb, D. Craig) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Varsity Brands Holding Company Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4222514), filed by Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Certificate of Insurance-July 31, 2017, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-Certificate of Insurance-May 7, 2020, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C-Certificate of Insurance-June 14, 2018)(Lamb, D. Craig) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less