This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2023 at 07:33:25 (UTC).

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP v. Becerra et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2023 AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Becerra. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00931

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

AstraZeneca AB

Defendants

Xavier Becerra

Chiquita Brooks-LaSure

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexandra M. Joyce

Daniel M. Silver

Catherine E. Stetson

Susan M. Cook

Marlan Golden

Defendant Attorneys

Alexander V Sverdlov

Stephen Michael Pezzi

 

Court Documents

20 #10

Exhibit 10

20 #9

Exhibit 9

20 #8

Exhibit 8

20 #7

Exhibit 7

20 #6

Exhibit 6

20 #5

Exhibit 5

20 #4

Exhibit 4

#20

(#20) DECLARATION re #19 Opening Brief in Support, of Marlan Golden by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

19 #1

Word Count Certification

6 #1

Exhibit A-B

5 #1

Exhibit A-B

#5

(#5) DECLARATION of Service on Samuel R. Bagenstos by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

4 #1

Summons Issued Chiquita Brooks-LaSure

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Xavier Becerra and Chiquita Brooks-LaSure on 8/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Chiquita Brooks-LaSure)(jfm) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (jfm) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4209061.) - filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jfm) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) DECLARATION re #19 Opening Brief in Support, of Marlan Golden by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Word Count Certification)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure- filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Redline)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) SO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION and Order Regarding Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. ORDER, Setting Hearings( An Oral Argument is set for 1/31/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/19/2023. (nmf) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Michael Pezzi on behalf of All Defendants (Pezzi, Stephen) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander V Sverdlov on behalf of All Defendants (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Catherine E. Stetson for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
08/30/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 08/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) DECLARATION of Service on David C. Weiss by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) DECLARATION of Service on Merrick B. Garland by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Service on Chiquita Brooks-LaSure by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) DECLARATION of Service on Xavier Becerra by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Service on Samuel R. Bagenstos by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Xavier Becerra and Chiquita Brooks-LaSure on 8/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Chiquita Brooks-LaSure)(jfm) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (jfm) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4209061.) - filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jfm) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less