This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2023 at 07:26:19 (UTC).

Willis v. Revlon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 Willis filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Revlon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary M. Rowland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-12465

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vicki Willis

Defendants

Revlon, Inc.

Revlon Consumer Products Corporation

Revlon Group Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A London

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Vicki Willis; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21070288.(London, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (London, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vicki Willis by Michael A London (London, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vicki Willis (London, Michael) (Entered: 11/10/2023)

 

Docket Entries

11/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vicki Willis (London, Michael) (Entered: 11/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (at) (Entered: 09/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

Docket(#4) MEMBER CASE OPENED from Northern District of Illinois; ( 1:23-cv-12465 Willis v. Revlon, Inc. et al / Direct file in ILND). In Re: Hair Relaxer Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation (MDL 3060 ) (jb, ) (Entered: 10/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vicki Willis by Michael A London (London, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (London, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Vicki Willis; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21070288.(London, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less